EP0978055 - CLIENT-SERVER APPLICATION DEVELOPMENT AND DEPLOYMENT SYSTEM AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.12.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.01.2004 [2004/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DuFresne, Fred B. 16 Bullard Street Sharon, MA 02067 / US | [2000/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUFRESNE, Fred, B. 16 Bullard Street Sharon, MA 02067 / US | [2000/06] | Representative(s) | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/06] | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen, et al Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 97922649.5 | 02.05.1997 | [2000/06] | WO1997US07532 | Priority number, date | US19960642426 | 03.05.1996 Original published format: US 642426 | [2000/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9742584 | Date: | 13.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0978055 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2000/06] | CPC: |
G06F21/6227 (EP,US);
G06F16/972 (EP,US);
H04L63/102 (EP,US);
H04L63/168 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/06] | Title | German: | ENTWICKLUNGS- UND EINSATZ-SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN VON BENUTZER-ANBIETER ANWENDUNGEN | [2002/51] | English: | CLIENT-SERVER APPLICATION DEVELOPMENT AND DEPLOYMENT SYSTEM AND METHODS | [2000/06] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDES DE DEVELOPPEMENT ET DE REPARTITION D'APPLICATIONS CLIENTS-SERVEURS | [2000/06] |
Former [2000/06] | BENUTZER-ANBIETER ANWENDUNGSENTWICKLUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.04.1999 | Examination requested [2000/06] | 16.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2002 | Observations by third parties | 10.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/05] | 22.08.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/05] | Divisional application(s) | EP03077287.5 / EP1380967 | EP06016821.8 / EP1727059 | EP10184053.6 / EP2273390 | EP10184065.0 / EP2273391 | EP10184785.3 / EP2293207 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.03.1999 | M01   Fee paid on   09.04.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0483576 (IBM [US]) [A] 1,23,25,30,32,34,56,57,62,64 * abstract * * page 4, column 6, line 13 - page 4, column 6, line 57; figure 4B * | other | US5623656 | - KINDEL C. ET AL, "Insering multimedia objects into HTML3", KINDEL C. ET AL, RAGETT D., HTML3 LINKING AND EMBEDDING, (19951221), pages 1 - 14, XP002956743 | - NCSA - HTTP SERVER SIDE INCLUDES, (19950613), pages 1 - 3, URL: http://hoohoo.ncsa.uiuc.edu/docs-1.4/tutorials/includes.html, XP002956744 | - SCHROEDER U. AND BRUNNER M., "Utilizing WWW and Mosaic for Computer Science Education", DARMSTADT, (19940530), pages 1 - 5, XP002956745 |