EP0981300 - ARTICULATING TOGGLE BOLT BONE SCREW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.02.2005 [2005/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mullane, Thomas S. 1201 River Reach Drive, No. 512 Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33315 / US | [2000/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | Rackham, Stephen Neil Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | Rackham, Stephen Neil GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 97922707.1 | 08.05.1997 | [2000/09] | WO1997US07723 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9849961 | Date: | 12.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0981300 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0981300 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/70 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
A61B17/7037 (EP,US);
A61B17/7041 (EP,US);
A61B17/7055 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00858 (EP,US);
A61B2090/037 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, SE [2000/09] | Title | German: | KNOCHENSCHRAUBE MIT GELENKKIPPDÜBEL | [2000/09] | English: | ARTICULATING TOGGLE BOLT BONE SCREW | [2000/09] | French: | VIS OSSEUSE COMBINEE A UN BOULON A AILETTES ARTICULE | [2000/09] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 22.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03026691.0 / EP1405606 | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.06.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]US4946458 (HARMS JUERGEN [DE], et al) [DX] 1,2,4,6,8 * column 2, line 16 - column 3, line 52; figures 1-3 *; | [X]WO9629947 (SMITH & NEPHEW RICHARDS INC [US]) [X] 1-4,6,8 * page 8, line 24 - page 10, line 18 * * page 11, line 23 - line 27; figures 3-5 *; | [E]US5628740 (MULLANE THOMAS S [US]) [E] 1-13* the whole document * |