EP0901492 - TAXANE DERIVATIVES, THE PREPARATION THEREOF AND FORMULATIONS CONTAINING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.07.2003 [2003/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INDENA S.p.A. Viale Ortles, 12 20139 Milano / IT | [1999/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOMBARDELLI, Ezio Via Val di Sole, 22 I-20141 Milano / IT | [1999/11] | Representative(s) | Minoja, Fabrizio Bianchetti & Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/11] | Minoja, Fabrizio, Dr. Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Rossini, 8 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 97922918.4 | 29.04.1997 | [1999/11] | WO1997EP02198 | Priority number, date | IT1996MI00942 | 10.05.1996 Original published format: IT MI960942 | [1999/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9743291 | Date: | 20.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0901492 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0901492 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07D491/08, C07D491/18, A61K31/415, // (C07D491/08, 305:00, 231:00),(C07D491/18, 317:00, 305:00, 231:00) | [1999/11] | CPC: |
C07D491/08 (EP,KR,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
C07D491/18 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/11] | Extension states | RO | 23.10.1998 | SI | 23.10.1998 | Title | German: | TAXANE DERIVATE, IHRE HERSTELLUNG UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN DIE SIE ENTHALTEN | [1999/11] | English: | TAXANE DERIVATIVES, THE PREPARATION THEREOF AND FORMULATIONS CONTAINING THEM | [1999/11] | French: | DERIVES DE TAXANE, LEUR PREPARATION ET FORMULATIONS LES CONTENANT | [1999/11] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.1998 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.10.1998 | Examination requested [1999/11] | 12.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0253738 (RHONE POULENC SANTE [FR]) [A] 1,10,11 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9425441 (DU PONT MERCK PHARMA [US]) [A] 1,10,11 * claim - *; | [A] - M.C.WANI ET AL, "Plant antitumor agents.VI The isolation and structure of taxol,a novel antileukemic and antitumor agent from Taxus brevifolia", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, DC US, (19710505), vol. 93, no. 9, pages 2325 - 2327, XP002037887 [A] 1,10,11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00738a045 |