EP0900260 - HIGH DI(ALKYL FATTY ESTER) QUATERNARY AMMONIUM COMPOUND FROM TRIALKANOL AMINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/10] | HIGH DI(ALKYL FATTY ESTER) QUATERNARY AMMONIUM COMPOUND FROM TRIETHANOL AMINE | ||
[2000/47] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 15.12.2006 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [1999/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IACOBUCCI, Paul, Albert 307 Cornwall Meadows Patterson, NY 12563 / US | 02 /
FRANKLIN, Ralph 25 Tamanny Trail Danbury, CT 06811 / US | 03 /
NGA, Phuong 288 Ashford Avenue Dobbs Ferry, NY 10522 / US | [1999/10] | Representative(s) | Alferink, Petrus J.T., et al Akzo Nobel Nederland B.V. Patent & Trademark Dept. P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/02] | Alferink, Petrus J.T., et al Akzo Nobel Nederland B.V. Patent & Trademark Dept. P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [1999/10] | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis, et al AKZO NOBEL N.V. Patent Department (Dept. APTA) P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | Application number, filing date | 97922934.1 | 25.04.1997 | [1999/10] | WO1997EP02239 | Priority number, date | US19960643218 | 03.05.1996 Original published format: US 643218 | [1999/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9742279 | Date: | 13.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0900260 | Date: | 10.03.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0900260 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/645, C07C213/06 | [1999/10] | CPC: |
A61K8/416 (EP,US);
A61Q5/12 (EP,US);
C07C213/06 (EP,US);
C07C219/06 (EP,US);
C11D1/62 (EP,US);
C11D3/001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/10] | Title | German: | LANGKETTIGE QUATERNÄRE AMMONIUMDIALKYLFETTSÄUREESTER AUS TRIALKANOLAMIN | [2000/47] | English: | HIGH DI(ALKYL FATTY ESTER) QUATERNARY AMMONIUM COMPOUND FROM TRIALKANOL AMINE | [2000/47] | French: | COMPOSE D'AMMONIUM QUATERNAIRE A BASE DE TRIETHANOLAMINE A HAUTE TENEUR EN DI(ALKYLESTERS D'ACIDES GRAS) PRODUIT A PARTIR DE TRIALKANOLAMINE | [2000/47] |
Former [1999/10] | LANGKETTIGE QUATERNÄRE AMMONIUMDIALHYLFETTSÄUREESTER AUS TRIETHANOLAMIN | ||
Former [1999/10] | HIGH DI(ALKYL FATTY ESTER) QUATERNARY AMMONIUM COMPOUND FROM TRIETHANOL AMINE | ||
Former [1999/10] | COMPOSE D'AMMONIUM QUATERNAIRE A BASE DE TRIETHANOLAMINE A HAUTE TENEUR EN DI(ALKYLESTERS D'ACIDES GRAS) PRODUIT A PARTIR DE TRIETHANOLAMINE | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.1998 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.10.1998 | Examination requested [1999/10] | 04.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.07.2002
25.07.2002
ADMISSIBLE Atofina Direction Recherche et Développement 4-8, cours Michelet La Défense 10 92091 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | 02
17.07.2002
29.07.2002
ADMISSIBLE Cognis Iberia, S.L. Poligono San Vicente 08755 Castellbisbal (Barcelona) / ES Opponent's representative Fabry, Bernd Cognis GmbH Postfach 13 01 64 40551 Düsseldorf / DE | 03
25.07.2002
07.08.2002
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | 04
29.07.2002
21.08.2002
ADMISSIBLE Degussa AG Intellectual Property Management Standort Wolfgang Postfach 1345 63403 Hanau / DE | 05
30.07.2002
13.08.2002
ADMISSIBLE Kao Corporation S.A. Puig dels Tudons, 10 08210 Barberà des Vallés / ES Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | 06
31.07.2002
19.08.2002
ADMISSIBLE STEPAN EUROPE S.A. Chemin Jongkind 38340 VOREPPE / FR Opponent's representative Maiwald, Walter Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.07.2002
25.07.2002
ADMISSIBLE Atofina Direction Recherche et Développement 4-8, cours Michelet La Défense 10 92091 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | ||
02
17.07.2002
29.07.2002
ADMISSIBLE Cognis Iberia, S.L. Poligono San Vicente 08755 Castellbisbal (Barcelona) / ES Opponent's representative Fabry, Bernd Cognis GmbH Postfach 13 01 64 40551 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
03
25.07.2002
07.08.2002
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | |||
04
29.07.2002
21.08.2002
ADMISSIBLE Degussa AG Intellectual Property Management, Standort Wolfgang Postfach 1345 63403 Hanau / DE | |||
05
30.07.2002
13.08.2002
ADMISSIBLE Kao Corporation S.A. Puig dels Tudons, 10 08210 Barberà des Vallés / ES Opponent's representative HOFFMANN EITLE, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | |||
06
31.07.2002
19.08.2002
ADMISSIBLE STEPAN EUROPE S.A. Chemin Jongkind 38340 VOREPPE / FR Opponent's representative Maiwald, Walter Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | |||
Former [2008/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.07.2002
25.07.2002
ADMISSIBLE Atofina Direction Recherche et Développement 4-8, cours Michelet La Défense 10 92091 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | ||
02
17.07.2002
29.07.2002
ADMISSIBLE Cognis Iberia, S.L. Poligono San Vicente 08755 Castellbisbal (Barcelona) / ES Opponent's representative Fabry, Bernd Cognis GmbH Postfach 13 01 64 40551 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
03
25.07.2002
07.08.2002
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | |||
04
29.07.2002
21.08.2002
ADMISSIBLE Degussa AG Intellectual Property Management, Standort Wolfgang Postfach 1345 63403 Hanau / DE | |||
05
30.07.2002
13.08.2002
ADMISSIBLE Kao Corporation S.A. Puig dels Tudons, 10 08210 Barberà des Vallés / ES Opponent's representative HOFFMANN EITLE, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | |||
06
31.07.2002
19.08.2002
ADMISSIBLE STEPAN EUROPE S.A. Chemin Jongkind 38340 VOREPPE / FR Opponent's representative Maiwald, Walter, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Postfach 33 05 23 80065 München / DE | |||
Former [2008/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.07.2002
25.07.2002
ADMISSIBLE Atofina Direction Recherche et Développement 4-8, cours Michelet La Défense 10 92091 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | ||
02
17.07.2002
29.07.2002
ADMISSIBLE Cognis Iberia, S.L. Poligono San Vicente 08755 Castellbisbal (Barcelona) / ES Opponent's representative Fabry, Bernd Cognis GmbH Postfach 13 01 64 40551 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
03
25.07.2002
07.08.2002
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | |||
04
29.07.2002
21.08.2002
ADMISSIBLE Degussa AG Intellectual Property Management, Standort Wolfgang Postfach 1345 63403 Hanau / DE | |||
05
30.07.2002
13.08.2002
ADMISSIBLE Kao Corporation S.A. Puig dels Tudons, 10 08210 Barberà des Vallés / ES Opponent's representative HOFFMANN EITLE, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | |||
06
31.07.2002
19.08.2002
ADMISSIBLE STEPAN EUROPE S.A. Chemin Jongkind 38340 VOREPPE / FR Opponent's representative Maiwald, Walter, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Postfach 33 05 23 80065 München / DE | |||
Former [2004/20] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.07.2002
25.07.2002
ADMISSIBLE Atofina Direction Recherche et Développement 4-8, cours Michelet La Défense 10 92091 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | ||
02
17.07.2002
29.07.2002
ADMISSIBLE Cognis Iberia, S.L. Poligono San Vicente 08755 Castellbisbal (Barcelona) / ES Opponent's representative Fabry, Bernd, Dr. c/o Cognis Deutschland GmbH & Co.KG, CRT-IP, Postfach 13 01 64 40551 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
03
25.07.2002
07.08.2002
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | |||
04
29.07.2002
21.08.2002
ADMISSIBLE Degussa AG Intellectual Property Management, Standort Wolfgang Postfach 1345 63403 Hanau / DE | |||
05
30.07.2002
13.08.2002
ADMISSIBLE Kao Corporation S.A. Puig dels Tudons, 10 08210 Barberà des Vallés / ES Opponent's representative HOFFMANN EITLE, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | |||
06
31.07.2002
19.08.2002
ADMISSIBLE STEPAN EUROPE S.A. Chemin Jongkind 38340 VOREPPE / FR Opponent's representative Maiwald, Walter, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Postfach 33 05 23 80065 München / DE | |||
Former [2002/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.07.2002
25.07.2002
ADMISSIBLE Atofina Direction Recherche et Développement 4-8, cours Michelet La Défense 10 92091 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | ||
02
17.07.2002
29.07.2002
ADMISSIBLE Cognis Iberia, S.L. Poligono San Vicente 08755 Castellbisbal (Barcelona) / ES Opponent's representative Fabry, Bernd, Dr. c/o Cognis Deutschland GmbH & Co.KG, CRT-IP, Postfach 13 01 64 40551 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
03
25.07.2002
07.08.2002
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Mather, Peter Geoffrey Procter & Gamble Services Company NV, 100 Temselaan 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | |||
04
29.07.2002
21.08.2002
ADMISSIBLE Degussa AG Intellectual Property Management, Standort Wolfgang Postfach 1345 63403 Hanau / DE | |||
05
30.07.2002
13.08.2002
ADMISSIBLE Kao Corporation S.A. Puig dels Tudons, 10 08210 Barberà des Vallés / ES Opponent's representative HOFFMANN EITLE, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | |||
06
31.07.2002
19.08.2002
ADMISSIBLE STEPAN EUROPE S.A. Chemin Jongkind 38340 VOREPPE / FR Opponent's representative Guerre, Dominique Cabinet Germain et Maureau, 12, rue Boileau, BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | |||
Former [2002/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.07.2002
25.07.2002
ADMISSIBLE Atofina Direction Recherche et Développement 4-8, cours Michelet La Défense 10 92091 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | ||
02
17.07.2002
29.07.2002
ADMISSIBLE Cognis Iberia, S.L. Poligono San Vicente 08755 Castellbisbal (Barcelona) / ES Opponent's representative Fabry, Bernd, Dr. c/o Cognis Deutschland GmbH & Co.KG, CRT-IP, Postfach 13 01 64 40551 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
03
25.07.2002
The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Mather, Peter Geoffrey Procter & Gamble Services Company NV, 100 Temselaan 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | |||
04
29.07.2002
DEGUSSA AG Benningsenplatz 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
Former [2002/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.07.2002
25.07.2002
ADMISSIBLE Atofina Direction Recherche et Développement 4-8, cours Michelet La Défense 10 92091 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | ||
02
17.07.2002
29.07.2002
ADMISSIBLE Cognis Iberia, S.L. Poligono San Vicente 08755 Castellbisbal (Barcelona) / ES Opponent's representative Fabry, Bernd, Dr. c/o Cognis Deutschland GmbH & Co.KG, CRT-IP, Postfach 13 01 64 40551 Düsseldorf / DE | 06.09.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.06.2003 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.10.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.10.2004 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 18.10.2006 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2007/03] | Appeal following opposition | 09.12.2004 | Appeal received No. T1430/04 | 18.02.2005 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.12.2006 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | 11.12.2006 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 18.10.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.11.2006 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.10.2001 | PT | 31.01.2002 | GR | 01.02.2002 | IE | 25.04.2002 | LU | 25.04.2002 | MC | 25.04.2002 | [2005/01] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 31.10.2001 | |
PT | 31.01.2002 | ||
IE | 25.04.2002 | ||
LU | 25.04.2002 | ||
MC | 25.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/29] | AT | 31.10.2001 | |
PT | 31.01.2002 | ||
IE | 25.04.2002 | ||
MC | 25.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/25] | AT | 31.10.2001 | |
PT | 31.01.2002 | ||
MC | 25.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 31.10.2001 | |
PT | 31.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | PT | 31.01.2002 | Cited in | International search | [DXA]WO9101295 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [DX] 1,4-8,22-26,29-31 * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 7, paragraph 2; example -; claim - * [A] 9-21,32,33; | [DA]EP0550361 (STEPAN EUROPE [FR]) [DA] 1-33* the whole document *; | [A]WO9404641 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [A] 1-33 * the whole document *; | [X]DE4243701 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1,22,29 * the whole document *; | [D]WO9414935 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al); | [DA]WO9420597 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [DA] 1-33 * page 8, line 24 - page 9, line 4; claim - *; | [A]DE4413431 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [A] 1-33 * page 3, line 8 - line 19 *; | [PX]EP0718275 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]) [PX] 1,22,29 * page 2, line 20 - line 22; claim - * |