EP0896660 - AUTOMATIC VALVE TEST APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Feelsure Health Corporation 503 Orchard Lane Winnetka, Illinois 60093-4114 / US | [2004/03] |
Former [1999/07] | For all designated states H.K. MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES INCORPORATED Suite 404, 2391 Northeast Loop 410 San Antonio, TX 78217 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIGACHYOV, Valery 25018 Granite Path San Antonio, TX 78258 / US | 02 /
COLLEY, Charles, D. 3303 Outrider San Antonio, Texas 78247 / US | [1999/15] |
Former [1999/11] | 01 /
MIGACHYOV, Valery 25018 Granite Path San Antonio, TX 78258 / US | ||
02 /
COLLEY, Charles, D. 13311 Galicia Universal City, TX 78148 / US | |||
Former [1999/07] | 01 /
MIGACHYOV, Valery Apartment 1608, 2555 Northeast Loop 410 San Antonio, TX 78217 / US | ||
02 /
COLLEY, Charles, D. 13311 Galicia Universal City, TX 78148 / US | Representative(s) | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter, et al Puschmann Borchert Bardehle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 12 31 80086 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter, et al Puschmann & Borchert Patentanwälte Bajuwarenring 21 82041 Oberhaching / DE | ||
Former [1999/07] | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte Kirschner & Kurig, Sollner Strasse 38 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97923531.4 | 02.05.1997 | [1999/16] | WO1997US07470 | Priority number, date | US19960642635 | 03.05.1996 Original published format: US 642635 | [1999/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9742481 | Date: | 13.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0896660 | Date: | 17.02.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0896660 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.11.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/12, G01N27/00 | [1999/17] | CPC: |
F16K37/0091 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/07] | G01N7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/07] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHES VENTIL-TESTGERÄT | [1999/07] | English: | AUTOMATIC VALVE TEST APPARATUS | [1999/07] | French: | APPAREIL DE CONTROLE AUTOMATIQUE DE SOUPAPES | [1999/07] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.1998 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.1998 | Search fee paid | 27.10.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.10.1998 | Examination requested [1999/07] | 18.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.11.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.08.2003 | BE | 06.08.2003 | DK | 06.11.2003 | GR | 06.11.2003 | PT | 06.01.2004 | LU | 02.05.2004 | [2005/23] |
Former [2004/31] | AT | 06.08.2003 | |
BE | 06.08.2003 | ||
DK | 06.11.2003 | ||
GR | 06.11.2003 | ||
PT | 06.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 06.08.2003 | |
BE | 06.08.2003 | ||
DK | 06.11.2003 | ||
GR | 06.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 06.08.2003 | |
BE | 06.08.2003 | ||
GR | 06.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 06.08.2003 | |
GR | 06.11.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3967645 (GREGORY ROY) [X] 1-20 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US4682491 (PICKARD MURPHY L [US]) [A] 1-20 * figure 2 *; | [A]US4786394 (ENZER STEVEN [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * figure 1 *; | [A]US4838257 (HATCH GUY M [US]) [A] 1-20 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0347015 (BEAR MED SYST INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5010599 (NILSSON LEIF [SE]) [A] 1-20* figure 1 *; | [A]US5331995 (WESTFALL THOMAS P [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * figure 2 *; | [A]WO9606569 (ABATIS MED TECH [IE], et al) [A] 1-20 * figures 1,2 * | International search | [A]US5331548 (ROLLEMA HARM J [NL], et al) |