EP0976033 - SEAMLESS APPLICATION INTERFACE MANAGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, LU | published on 20.07.2011 [2011/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated 250 Vesey Street New York, NY 10281 / US | [2008/33] |
Former [2000/05] | For all designated states Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated 250 Vesey Street New York, NY 10281 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIZI, Anthony, C. 16 Black Hawk Court Cranbury, NJ 08512 / US | 02 /
KANEVSKY, Paul 3 Redwood Court Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 / US | [2000/05] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/45] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al R G C Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2000/05] | Milhench, Howard Leslie, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97923537.1 | 05.05.1997 | [2000/05] | WO1997US07502 | Priority number, date | US19960642212 | 06.05.1996 Original published format: US 642212 | [2000/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9742568 | Date: | 13.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0976033 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0976033 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.11.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/40, G06F9/44, G06F9/46 | [2001/38] | CPC: |
G06F9/542 (EP,US);
G06F9/451 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/05] | G06F9/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/05] | Title | German: | SAUMLOSER ANWENDUNGSSCHNITTSTELLENVERWALTER | [2000/05] | English: | SEAMLESS APPLICATION INTERFACE MANAGER | [2000/05] | French: | GESTIONNAIRE D'INTERFACE D'APPLICATION A ACCES TRANSPARENT | [2000/05] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.1998 | Search fee paid | 03.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.12.1998 | Examination requested [2000/05] | 24.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 23.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/30] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 23.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.08.2008 | BE | 13.08.2008 | DK | 13.08.2008 | FI | 13.08.2008 | IT | 13.08.2008 | NL | 13.08.2008 | SE | 13.11.2008 | GR | 14.11.2008 | ES | 24.11.2008 | PT | 13.01.2009 | IE | 05.05.2009 | LU | 05.05.2009 | [2011/25] |
Former [2010/28] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
IE | 05.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/05] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 13.08.2008 | |
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 13.08.2008 | |
ES | 24.11.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO9531781 (APPLE COMPUTER [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,12 * abstract * * page 1, line 8 - line 15 * * page 3, line 10 - line 17 * * page 7, line 7 - line 9 * * page 8, line 15 - line 19 * * page 25, line 26 - line 28 * * page 26, line 25 - page 27, line 14 * [A] 3-5; | [YA] - R BECK ET AL, OS/2 Version 2.0 - Volume 2: DOS and Windows Environment, BOCA RATON, FLORIDA, IBM CORPORATION, INTERNATIONAL TECHNICAL SUPPORT CENTER, (199204), XP002173368 [Y] 1,2,4,6-13 * pages 1-17, 128-153, 172-181, 196-225; page 1; figures 1,2,4,45,50 * * page 3, line 1 - line 8 * * page 5, line 43 - page 7, line 13 * * page 10, line 25 - page 11, line 2 * * page 151, line 14 - page 153, line L * * page 180, line 10 - line L * * page 197, line 8 - line 13 * [A] 3,5 | [YA] - H M DEITEL, M S KOGAN, The Design of OS/2, READING, MASSACHUSETTS, ADDISON-WESLEY PUBLISHING COMPANY, (1992), XP002173369 [Y] 4,6-11,13 * pages 216-219, 262-277, 290-295, 328-333, 346-349; page 216, line 35 - page 217, line 25; figures 9.1,9.3,9.5,10.3; table 7.4 * * page 263, line 4 - line 11 * * page 266, line 3 - page 268, line 1 * * page 268, line 21 - line 33 * * page 273, line 17 - line 22 * * page 276, line 9 - line 27 * * page 291, line L - page 295, line 11 * * page 331, line 19 - page 332, line 4 * * page 347, line 1 - line 17 * * page 348, line 26 - line 33 * [A] 1,5,12 | [A] - UDELL J, "CITRIX'S NEW MULTIUSER OS/2", BYTE,US,MCGRAW-HILL INC. ST PETERBOROUGH, (1991), vol. 16, no. 1, ISSN 0360-5280, pages 134 - 136,138, XP002023070 [A] 4,13 * page 136, column R, line 4 - line 26 * | [A] - "REGISTER AND DEREGISTER ALARM FILTERS USING FILES", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN,US,IBM CORP. NEW YORK, (19940801), vol. 37, no. 8, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 115 - 120, XP000456184 [A] 3,5 * page 115 * | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "Change-Notification Service for Shared Files", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN,US,IBM CORP. NEW YORK, (199308), vol. 36, no. 8, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 77 - 82, XP002108713 [A] 12 * page 77, line 15 - line 19 * * page 78, line 10 * | International search | [Y]US5237684 (RECORD STEPHEN E [US], et al); | [Y]US5414812 (FILIP MICHAEL J [US], et al); | [YP]US5546541 (DREW ROBERT M [US], et al) |