EP0910665 - IDENTIFICATION OF NUMERICAL CHANGES IN CELL DNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2003 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.06.2003 [2003/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsches Krebsforschungszentrum Stiftung des öffentlichen Rechts Im Neuenheimer Feld 280 69120 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/26] | For all designated states Deutsches Krebsforschungszentrum Stiftung des öffentlichen Rechts Im Neuenheimer Feld 280 69120 Heidelberg / DE | ||
Former [1999/17] | For all designated states Deutsches Krebsforschungszentrum Stiftung des öffentlichen Rechts Im Neuenheimer Feld 280 69120 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOOS, Stefan Platanenweg 3 D-69221 Dossenheim / DE | 02 /
LICHTER, Peter Am Gro en Wald 36 D-69251 Gaiberg / DE | [1999/17] | Representative(s) | Schüssler, Andrea Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | Schüssler, Andrea, Dr. Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97923750.0 | 23.04.1997 | [1999/17] | WO1997DE00814 | Priority number, date | DE1996116381 | 24.04.1996 Original published format: DE 19616381 | [1999/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9740185 | Date: | 30.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0910665 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0910665 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [1999/17] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6809 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6841 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/17] | Title | German: | NACHWEIS NUMERISCHER VERÄNDERUNGEN IN DER DNA VON ZELLEN | [1999/17] | English: | IDENTIFICATION OF NUMERICAL CHANGES IN CELL DNA | [1999/17] | French: | DETECTION DE VARIATIONS NUMERIQUES DANS L'ADN DE CELLULES | [1999/17] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/17] | 10.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2001 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   25.07.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0341491 (MOLECULAR THERAPEUTICS INC [US])[A] 1; | [A]WO9514085 (DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC [US], et al) [A] 1,2,8 | [A] - A. KALLIONIEMI et al., "Comparative Genomic Hybri- dization for Molecular Cyto- genetic Analysis od Solid Tumors", SCIENCE, (19921030), vol. 258, pages 818 - 821 [A] 1 |