EP0906287 - SUBSTITUTED PYRAZOLYL-PYRAZOLE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS HERBICIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.2004 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.06.2004 [2004/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt/Main / DE | [2002/36] |
Former [2000/38] | For all designated states Aventis CropScience GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2000/18] | For all designated states Aventis CropScience GmbH Miraustr. 54 13509 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1999/14] | For all designated states Hoechst Schering AgrEvo GmbH Miraustrasse 54 13509 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GANZER, Michael Eichborndamm 279 D-13437 Berlin / DE | 02 /
FRANKE, Helga Spie ergasse 6b D-13503 Berlin / DE | 03 /
HARTFIEL, Uwe Gro er Hasenpfad 120 D-60598 Frankfurt / DE | 04 /
BOHNER, Jürgen Markelstrasse 45 D-12163 Berlin / DE | [1999/14] | Application number, filing date | 97924005.8 | 26.05.1997 | [1999/14] | WO1997EP02690 | Priority number, date | DE1996123892 | 06.06.1996 Original published format: DE 19623892 | [1999/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9746536 | Date: | 11.12.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0906287 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07D231/52, A01N43/56, C07D405/14, C07D409/14, C07D471/04, C07D493/04 | [1999/14] | CPC: |
C07D405/14 (EP,US);
C07D231/12 (KR);
A01N43/56 (EP,US);
A01N43/90 (EP,US);
C07D231/52 (EP,US);
C07D493/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, PT [1999/14] | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE PYRAZOLYL-PYRAZOLDERIVATE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS HERBIZIDE | [1999/14] | English: | SUBSTITUTED PYRAZOLYL-PYRAZOLE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS HERBICIDES | [1999/14] | French: | DERIVES DE PYRAZOLYLE-PYRAZOL SUBSTITUES ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME HERBICIDES | [1999/14] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/14] | 07.04.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]WO9609303 (HOECHST SCHERING AGREVO GMBH [DE], et al) [DX] 1-5 * page 30 - page 32; claim 1 * * page 18 - page 19; example 6 *; | [PX]DE19532347 (BAYER AG [DE]) [PX] 1,3-5* page 18; claim 1 * |