EP0852844 - CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT COMPRISING A POWER AMPLIFIER STAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2003/20] | For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2002/40] | For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH 20099 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2000/02] | For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | |||
Former [1998/35] | For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [1998/29] | For:FR
GB
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPARKS, Geoffrey, Sidney Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1998/29] | Representative(s) | Peters, Carl Heinrich, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/29] | Peters, Carl Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97924212.0 | 18.06.1997 | [1998/29] | WO1997IB00730 | Priority number, date | EP19960110470 | 28.06.1996 Original published format: EP 96110470 | [1998/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9800907 | Date: | 08.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0852844 | Date: | 15.07.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0852844 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 08.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H03F1/32, H03G3/20 | [1998/29] | CPC: |
H03F1/3241 (EP,US);
H03F2200/372 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/29] | Title | German: | SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG MIT EINER LEISTUNGSVERSTÄRKERSTUFE | [1998/30] | English: | CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT COMPRISING A POWER AMPLIFIER STAGE | [1998/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CIRCUIT COMPRENANT UN ETAGE D'AMPLIFICATION DE PUISSANCE | [1998/29] |
Former [1998/29] | SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG MIT LEISTUNGSVERSTÄRKERSTUFE | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/42] | 21.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XL]EP0638994 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD [GB], et al); | [X]EP0648012 (LINEAR MODULATION TECH [GB]); | [A]WO9507573 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) |