EP0904261 - QUATERNARY AMMONIUM COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.04.2003 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2003 | Refusal of application | published on 21.05.2003 [2003/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eka Chemicals AB 445 80 Bohus / SE | [1999/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GORZYNSKI, Marek, A. Am Courtenbachshof 3 D-52349 Düren / DE | 02 /
MACHEREY, J., Heribert Altenweiher 15 D-52372 Kreuzau / DE | [1999/13] | Representative(s) | Jönsson, Christer Akzo Nobel AB Legal & IP P.O. Box 11500 100 61 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | Jönsson, Christer Eka Chemicals AB, Patent Department, Box 11556 100 61 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 97924459.7 | 27.05.1997 | [1999/13] | WO1997SE00873 | Priority number, date | SE19960002041 | 28.05.1996 Original published format: SE 9602041 | US19960019200P | 06.06.1996 Original published format: US 19200 P | [1999/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9745395 | Date: | 04.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0904261 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 04.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07C215/40, C08G18/08 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
C08G18/36 (EP);
C07C215/40 (EP);
C08G18/0814 (EP);
C08G18/10 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/3275 (EP);
C08G18/10, C08G18/3278 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/13] | Title | German: | QUATERNÄRE AMMONIUMVERBINDUNGEN | [1999/13] | English: | QUATERNARY AMMONIUM COMPOUNDS | [1999/13] | French: | COMPOSES D'AMMONIUM QUATERNAIRE | [1999/13] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/13] | 30.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2003/21] | 02.01.2003 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2003/21] | Request for further processing for: | 06.11.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 06.11.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.11.2001 | Decision despatched | 05.09.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 05.09.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.09.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0541289 ; | [A]GB1491091 |