EP0901634 - A SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING AT LEAST ONE PARAMETER OF AT LEAST ONE SAMPLE OF A PHYSIOLOGICAL LIQUID AND A CASSETTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/11] | A METHOD AND A SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING AT LEAST ONE PARAMETER OF AT LEAST ONE SAMPLE OF A PHYSIOLOGICAL LIQUID, A HOLDER AND A TEST DEVICE | ||
[2001/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.03.2003 [2003/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RADIOMETER MEDICAL A/S Akandevej 21 2700 Broenshoej / DK | [1999/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUNDSGAARD, Finn, Chresten Hojgardstoften 222 DK-2630 Taastrup / DK | 02 /
KAGENOW, Henrik Sportsvej 19 DK-7500 Holstebro / DK | 03 /
ANDERSEN, Willy Roligheds Allé 51 DK-3060 Esperg rde / DK | 04 /
FRISCHAUF, Peter, Aage Bygaden 72C DK-2605 Br ndby / DK | [1999/11] | Application number, filing date | 97924933.1 | 27.05.1997 | [1999/11] | WO1997DK00238 | Priority number, date | DK19960000615 | 30.05.1996 Original published format: DK 61596 | [1999/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9746887 | Date: | 11.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0901634 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0901634 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 11.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/00, G01N35/10, B01L9/06 | [1999/11] | CPC: |
G01N35/025 (EP,US);
G01N33/4925 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00277 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00752 (EP,US);
G01N2035/041 (EP,US);
Y10T436/11 (EP,US);
Y10T436/111666 (EP,US);
Y10T436/113332 (EP,US);
Y10T436/114165 (EP,US);
Y10T436/25 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1999/11] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR BESTIMMUNG MINDESTENS EINES PARAMETERS MINDESTENS EINER PROBE EINER PHYSIOLOGISCHEN FLÜSSIGKEIT UND KASSETTE DAFÜR | [2001/24] | English: | A SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING AT LEAST ONE PARAMETER OF AT LEAST ONE SAMPLE OF A PHYSIOLOGICAL LIQUID AND A CASSETTE | [2001/24] | French: | SYSTEME DE DETERMINATION D'AU MOINS UN PARAMETRE D'AU MOINS UN ECHANTILLON D'UN LIQUIDE PHYSIOLOGIQUE ET CASSETTE | [2001/24] |
Former [1999/11] | PROZESS UND SYSTEM ZUR BESTIMMUNG MINDESTENS EINES PARAMETERS MINDESTENS EINER PROBE EINER PHYSIOLOGISCHEN FLÜSSIGKEIT, HALTERUNG UND TESTGERÄT | ||
Former [1999/11] | A METHOD AND A SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING AT LEAST ONE PARAMETER OF AT LEAST ONE SAMPLE OF A PHYSIOLOGICAL LIQUID, A HOLDER AND A TEST DEVICE | ||
Former [1999/11] | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE DETERMINATION D'AU MOINS UN PARAMETRE D'AU MOINS UN ECHANTILLON D'UN LIQUIDE PHYSIOLOGIQUE, ELEMENT DE RETENUE ET DISPOSITIF D'ESSAI | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/11] | 02.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/11] | Request for further processing for: | 10.04.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 10.04.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.04.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 20.03.2002 | [2003/09] | Cited in | International search | [A]US4007013 (KOTACKA KARL); | [X]US4218421 (MACK JOHN C JR [US], et al); | [A]WO8904474 (BIOLOG INC [US]); | [A]WO8904955 (TECHNICON INSTR [US]); | [A]EP0390315 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]); | [A]EP0502691 (BIOTRACK INC [US]); | [Y]US5489414 (SCHREIBER JOERG [DE], et al) |