EP0902817 - DE-/ANTIICING AGENT BASED ON ACETATES AND/OR FORMATES, AND PROCESS FOR MELTING, USING SAID AGENT, SNOW AND ICE ON AREAS FOR TRAFFIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/12] | DEFROSTING AGENT BASED ON ACETATES AND/OR FORMATES, AND PROCESS FOR MELTING, USING SAID AGENT, SNOW AND ICE ON AREAS FOR TRAFFIC | ||
[2001/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2002 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.05.2002 [2002/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [1999/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STANKOWIAK, Achim Carl-Orff-Strasse 4 D-84503 Altötting / DE | 02 /
BECKER, Wilfried Am Bürgerwald 4 D-84524 Neuötting / DE | [1999/12] | Application number, filing date | 97925020.6 | 30.05.1997 | [1999/12] | WO1997EP02810 | Priority number, date | DE1996122857 | 07.06.1996 Original published format: DE 19622857 | DE1996148716 | 25.11.1996 Original published format: DE 19648716 | [1999/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9747703 | Date: | 18.12.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/54] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0902817 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0902817 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C09K3/18 | [1999/12] | CPC: |
C07C53/10 (EP,US);
C07C53/06 (EP,US);
C09K3/185 (EP,US);
C23F11/182 (EP,US);
C23F11/187 (EP,US);
C23F11/188 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, FI, GB, IT, LI, SE [1999/12] | Title | German: | ENTEISUNGSMITTEL AUF DER BASIS VON ACETATEN UND/ODER FORMIATEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM SCHMELZEN VON SCHNEE UND EIS AUF VERKEHRSFLÄCHEN MIT HILFE DIESES MITTELS | [1999/12] | English: | DE-/ANTIICING AGENT BASED ON ACETATES AND/OR FORMATES, AND PROCESS FOR MELTING, USING SAID AGENT, SNOW AND ICE ON AREAS FOR TRAFFIC | [2001/21] | French: | DEGIVRANT A BASE D'ACETATES ET/OU DE FORMIATES ET PROCEDE POUR FAIRE FONDRE DE LA NEIGE ET DU VERGLAS SUR DES ZONES DE CIRCULATION A L'AIDE DUDIT AGENT | [1999/12] |
Former [1999/12] | DEFROSTING AGENT BASED ON ACETATES AND/OR FORMATES, AND PROCESS FOR MELTING, USING SAID AGENT, SNOW AND ICE ON AREAS FOR TRAFFIC | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/12] | 11.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4803007 (GARBER FRANK R [US]) [A] 1,4 * column 2, line 3 - line 17 ** column 3, line 7 - line 44 *; | [DA]EP0375214 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB]) [DA] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE4034217 (LANG CHEM TECH PROD [AT]) [DA] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [A]US5127954 (JOHNSTON ALLAN [US], et al) [A] 1,4 * column 1, line 31 - line 37 * * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 20 * * column 3, line 27 - line 33 * * examples 1-4; table 1 *; | [A]EP0494506 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB]) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9417152 (GEN ATOMICS INT SERV [US]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US5435930 (CHAN STEPHEN K [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document * |