EP0959738 - BED BASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 09.11.2005 [2005/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jansson, Ulf Badhusgatan 17 453 30 Lysekil / SE | [1999/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THULESKÄR, Börje deceased / SE | [1999/48] | Representative(s) | Mossmark, Anders Lennart Zacco Sweden AB Torggatan 8 Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/48] | Mossmark, Anders Albihns Patentbyra Göteborg AB P.O.Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 97925363.0 | 28.05.1997 | [1999/48] | WO1997SE00866 | Priority number, date | SE19960002050 | 29.05.1996 Original published format: SE 9602050 | [1999/48] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9745041 | Date: | 04.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0959738 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0959738 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 04.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A47C27/14 | [1999/48] | CPC: |
A47C23/30 (EP);
A47C27/064 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FI, GB, SE [1999/48] | Title | German: | UNTERMATRATZE | [1999/48] | English: | BED BASE | [1999/48] | French: | BASE DE LIT | [1999/48] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.1997 | Translation filed | 21.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 21.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/48] | 07.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 12.02.2004 | DE | 13.02.2004 | GB | 28.05.2004 | [2005/45] |
Former [2004/44] | DK | 12.02.2004 | |
DE | 13.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | DK | 12.02.2004 | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB996425 ; | [Y]EP0052389 ; | [Y]US2789628 ; | [Y]US2794991 ; | [Y]US3087171 ; | [Y]US3255469 |