EP0896775 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DISPLAYING AN ELECTRONIC PROGRAMME GUIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/07] | INFORMATION SYSTEM | ||
[2002/20] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 10.05.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2013 | Change - German title | published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] | 10.05.2013 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Starsight Telecast, Inc. 2830 De La Cruz Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US | [2013/24] |
Former [2011/39] | For all designated states Starsight Telecast, Inc. 2830 De La Cruz Boulevard Santa Clara CA 95050 / US | ||
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states STARSIGHT TELECAST, INC. 6922 Hollywood Boulevard Los Angeles California 90028 / US | ||
Former [1999/07] | For all designated states STARSIGHT TELECAST, INC. 39650 Liberty Street, Third Floor Fremont, CA 94538 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLOSTERMAN, Brian, L. 310 Rio Grande Place San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | 02 /
SCHEIN, Steven 1326 Hoover Street 10 Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [1999/07] | Representative(s) | Hale, Peter, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | Hale, Peter, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [1999/07] | Kinsler, Maureen Catherine, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97925449.7 | 02.05.1997 | [1999/07] | WO1997US07499 | Priority number, date | US19960016871P | 03.05.1996 Original published format: US 16871 P | US19960032038P | 26.11.1996 Original published format: US 32038 P | [1999/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9742763 | Date: | 13.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0896775 | Date: | 17.02.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0896775 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0896775 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.11.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/173, H04N7/15, H04N7/16 | [1999/07] | CPC: |
H04N7/0882 (EP,US);
H04N21/431 (KR);
G06F3/04842 (US);
G06F3/0481 (US);
H04N21/4314 (EP,US);
H04N21/4316 (EP,US);
H04N21/4438 (EP,US);
H04N21/4622 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
H04N21/47214 (EP,US);
H04N21/4725 (EP,US);
H04N21/4782 (EP,US);
H04N21/482 (EP,US);
H04N21/4821 (EP,US);
H04N21/488 (EP,US);
H04N21/4886 (EP,US);
H04N21/812 (EP,US);
H04N21/8126 (EP,US);
H04N21/84 (EP,US);
H04N21/8586 (EP,US);
H04N7/163 (EP,US);
H04N7/165 (EP,US);
H04N7/17318 (EP,US);
H04N7/17354 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN PROGRAMMÜBERSICHT | [2013/24] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DISPLAYING AN ELECTRONIC PROGRAMME GUIDE | [2002/20] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'AFFICHAGE DE DONNEES GUIDE DE PROGRAMME ELECTRONIQUE | [2002/20] |
Former [1999/07] | NACHRICHTENSYSTEM | ||
Former [1999/07] | INFORMATION SYSTEM | ||
Former [1999/07] | SYSTEME D'INFORMATION | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.1998 | Search fee paid | 30.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/07] | 21.11.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 22.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 28.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.07.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02078962.4 / EP1292140 | EP06007965.4 / EP1696667 | EP06075928.9 | EP08104894.4 / EP1983754 | EP10179771.0 / EP2276249 | EP10179773.6 / EP2276250 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.10.2002
13.10.2003
ADMISSIBLE IGR GmbH & Co. KG. Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred Maryniok GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Leibnizstrasse 6 95447 Bayreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.10.2002
13.10.2003
ADMISSIBLE IGR GmbH & Co. KG. Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred Maryniok & Partner, Kuhbergstrasse 23 96317 Kronach / DE | ||
Former [2003/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.10.2002
Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. Maryniok & Partner, Kuhbergstrasse 23 96317 Kronach / DE | 07.11.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.03.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 13.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M08) | 23.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 23.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 20.12.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.02.2006 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.02.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 30.04.2009 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 04.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 26.04.2013 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 11.04.2006 | Appeal received No. T0533/06 | 20.06.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.04.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | 06.04.2006 | Appeal received No. T0533/06 | 16.06.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.04.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9609721 (TV GUIDE ON SCREEN [US]) [A] 1-4,12,13,16,17 * page 3, line 19 - page 4, line 14 * * page 28, line 10 - page 31, line 2; figure 12 * * page 5, line 10 - page 6, line 3 * * page 8, line 17 - line 22; figures 5A-1,5C,7C *; | [A]US5353121 (YOUNG PATRICK [US], et al) [A] 1-4,12,13,16,17 * abstract * * column 4, line 62 - column 6, line 9; figures 1-7,13 *; | [A]US4894789 (YEE KEEN Y [US]) [A] 16 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 33; figure . *; | [A]EP0554577 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1,16,17 * the whole document * | International search | [X]WO9501059 (APPLE COMPUTER [US]); | [XP]US5585866 (MILLER LARRY [US], et al) | Opposition | WO9607270 | DE4427046 | DE4437928 |