EP0906384 - DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.09.2000 [2000/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/14] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DODD, Ian, Martin 40 Clousden Grange Killingworth Village Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 0YW / GB | 02 /
THOEN, Christiaan, Arthur 35 Preston Wood North Shields Tyne & Wear NE30 3LT / GB | 03 /
MOSS, Michael, Alan, John 13 Painshawfield Stocksfield Northumberland NE43 7DZ / GB | 04 /
CUNNINGHAM, Philip, Andrew 10 Denewell Avenue High Heaton Newcastle upon Tyne NE7 7YB / GB | [1999/14] | Representative(s) | Peet, Jillian Wendy, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/14] | Peet, Jillian Wendy, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Whitley Road, Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 97925580.9 | 15.05.1997 | [1999/14] | WO1997US08234 | Priority number, date | GB19960011322 | 31.05.1996 Original published format: GB 9611322 | [1999/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9745511 | Date: | 04.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0906384 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.12.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/62 | [1999/14] | CPC: |
C11D1/62 (EP);
C11D3/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/14] | Title | German: | WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [1999/14] | English: | DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS | [1999/14] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DETERGENTES | [1999/14] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.1998 | Search fee paid | 23.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/14] | 04.02.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/37] | 06.04.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO9717419 (UNILEVER) [E] 1,3-5,7-9 * examples A-M * | International search | [X]US5500138 ; | [X]US5445757 ; | [A]US4239660 ; | [A]US4187184 ; | [A]US4260529 ; | [A]US5185088 ; | [A]US5399272 ; | [A]US5427697 |