EP0954604 - GLYCERALDEHYDE-3-PHOSPHATE DEHYDROGENASE AND NUCLEAR RESTORATION OF CYTOPLASMIC MALE STERILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2005 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.05.2005 [2005/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McGill University 845 Sherbrooke Street West Montréal Québec H3A 1B1 / CA | For all designated states UNIVERSITE DE MONTREAL 2900, Boulevard Edouard-Monpetit Montreal Quebec H3C 3J7 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2000/25] | For all designated states McGILL UNIVERSITY 845 Sherbrooke Street West Montreal, Québec H3A 1B1 / CA | ||
For all designated states UNIVERSITE DE MONTREAL 2900, Boulevard Edouard-Monpetit Montreal, Quebec H3C 3J7 / CA | |||
Former [1999/45] | For all designated states McGILL UNIVERSITY 845 Sherbrooke Street West Montreal, Québec H3A 1B1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWN, Gregory, G. 4990 West Broadway Montréal, Québec H4V 1Z9 / CA | 02 /
LANDRY, Benoit 133 Allée des Cigales L'Acadie, Québec J3J 1H0 / CA | 03 /
JEAN, Martine 877 Delage 3 Sainte-Foy, Québec G1V 3X3 / CA | [1999/45] | Representative(s) | Jacob, Reuben Ellis, et al Marks & Clerk Incorporating Edward Evans Barker Clifford's Inn Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/25] | Jacob, Reuben Ellis, et al Edward Evans & Co., Clifford's Inn, Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BX / GB | ||
Former [1999/45] | Jacob, Reuben Ellis Edward Evans & Co., Chancery House, 53-64 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1SD / GB | Application number, filing date | 97925801.9 | 16.06.1997 | [1999/45] | WO1997CA00424 | Priority number, date | US19960020553P | 26.06.1996 Original published format: US 20553 P | [1999/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9749831 | Date: | 31.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/57] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0954604 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C12N15/82, C12N15/53, C12N15/05 | [1999/45] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/45] | Title | German: | GLYCERIN-ALDEHYD-3-PHOSPHAT DEHYDROGENASE UND DIE WIEDERHERSTELLUNG ZYTOPLASMATISCHER STERILITÄT IM KERN | [1999/45] | English: | GLYCERALDEHYDE-3-PHOSPHATE DEHYDROGENASE AND NUCLEAR RESTORATION OF CYTOPLASMIC MALE STERILITY | [1999/45] | French: | GLYCERALDEHYDE-3-PHOSPHATE DESHYDROGENASE ET RESTAURATION NUCLEAIRE DE LA STERILITE MALE DU CYTOPLASME | [1999/45] | Entry into regional phase | 06.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 06.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/45] | 03.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/19] | 19.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A] - SINGH M ET AL, "Nuclear genes associated with a single Brassica CMS restorer locus influence transcripts of three different mitochondrial gene regions", GENETICS, (199605), vol. 143, no. 1, page 505-16, XP002043618 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - WISE R ET AL, "mapping complementary genes in maize: Positioning the RF1 and RF2 nuclear-fertility restorer loci of texas (T) cytoplasm relative to RFLP and visible markers", THEORETICAL AND APPLIED GENETICS, (1994), vol. 88, no. 6-7, pages 785 - 95, XP002043619 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01253987 | [A] - DELOURME R ET AL, "Identification of RAPD markers linked to a fertility restorer gene for the Ogura radish cytoplasmic male fertility of rapeseed (Brassica napus L.)", THEORETICAL AND APPLIED GENETICS, (1994), vol. 88, no. 6-7, pages 741 - 48, XP002043620 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01253979 | [A] - SCHNABLE P ET AL, "Recovery of heritible, transposon-induced, mutant alleles of the RF2 nuclear restorer of T-cytoplasm maize", GENETICS, (1994), vol. 136, no. 3, pages 1171 - 85, XP002043621 [A] 1 * the whole document * |