EP0837780 - HAND MOVABLE TRANSFER CART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WANZL METALLWARENFABRIK GMBH Postfach 11 29 89336 Leipheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/24] | For all designated states Wanzl Metallwarenfabrik GmbH Postfach 11 29 89336 Leipheim / DE | ||
Former [1998/18] | For all designated states Wanzl GmbH & Co. Entwicklungs-KG Postfach 11 29 D-89336 Leipheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANZL, Rudolf Sonnenweg 8 D-89340 Leipheim / DE | [1998/18] | Application number, filing date | 97925851.4 | 15.05.1997 | [1998/18] | WO1997DE01013 | Priority number, date | DE1996119579 | 15.05.1996 Original published format: DE 19619579 | DE1996143121 | 18.10.1996 Original published format: DE 19643121 | [1998/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9743135 | Date: | 20.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0837780 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0837780 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B60B33/00 | [1998/18] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1998/18] | Title | German: | VON HAND BEWEGBARER TRANSPORTWAGEN | [1998/18] | English: | HAND MOVABLE TRANSFER CART | [1998/18] | French: | CHARIOT TRANSPORTEUR DEPLACABLE MANUELLEMENT | [2001/01] |
Former [1998/18] | CHARIOT TRANSPORTEUR DEPLA ABLE MANUELLEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/18] | 23.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 07.11.2001 | NL | 07.11.2001 | SE | 07.02.2002 | ES | 30.05.2002 | [2008/07] |
Former [2004/04] | NL | 07.11.2001 | |
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
ES | 30.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 07.11.2001 | |
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/27] | SE | 07.02.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1422365 (REUNIS SA ATELIERS) [A] 1 * page 2, line 72 - line 81; figure - *; | [AD]DE2543211 (WANZL METALLWARENFABRIK KG); | [X]DE2548646 (MARUWA ECHO CO) [X] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]FR2529139 (REUNIS SA ATELIERS [FR]) [A] 1 * page 8 - page 9; figure - *; | [A]DE8511713U (ALBERT SCHULTE SÖHNE) [A] 1 * page 2 - page 5; figure - *; | [A]DE3410536 (SCHULTE SOEHNE GMBH CO A [DE]); | [A]EP0190376 (TENTE ROLLEN GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * page 8; figure - *; | [A]FR2581933 (REUNIS SA ATELIERS [FR]) [A] 1 * page 11 - page 12; figure - *; | [DA]EP0242756 (SCHULTE SOEHNE KG A [DE]); | [DA]DE9216608U (TENTE-ROLLEN) |