EP0916119 - TRIPLE MODULAR REDUNDANT COMPUTER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Resilience Corporation Suite 120, 1755 Embarcadero Road Palo Alto, CA 94043 / US | [1999/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETIVAN, James, L. Palo Alto, CA . / US | 02 /
LUNDELL, Donald, C. Palo Alto, CA . / US | 03 /
LUNDELL, Jonathan, K. Skull Valley, AZ . / US | [1999/20] | Representative(s) | Smith, Samuel Leonard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/20] | Smith, Samuel Leonard J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 97926550.1 | 15.05.1997 | [1999/20] | WO1997US08320 | Priority number, date | US19960017201P | 16.05.1996 Original published format: US 17201 P | US19970037363P | 03.02.1997 Original published format: US 37363 P | US19970853670 | 09.05.1997 Original published format: US 853670 | [2001/46] |
Former [1999/21] | US19960017201P | 16.05.1996 | |
US19970037363P | 03.02.1997 | ||
US19970583670 | 09.05.1997 | ||
Former [1999/20] | US19960017201P | 16.05.1996 | |
US19970037363P | 03.02.1997 | ||
US19970853670 | 09.05.1997 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9743712 | Date: | 20.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0916119 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0916119 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/18, G06F1/04 | [1999/20] | CPC: |
G06F11/165 (EP,US);
G06F11/181 (EP,US);
G06F11/182 (EP,US);
G06F11/187 (EP,US);
G06F11/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/20] | Title | German: | DREIFACH REDUNDANTES MODULARES RECHNERSYSTEM | [1999/20] | English: | TRIPLE MODULAR REDUNDANT COMPUTER SYSTEM | [1999/20] | French: | SYSTEME INFORMATIQUE REDONDANT A TROIS MODULES | [1999/20] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/20] | 18.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.12.2001 | BE | 05.12.2001 | CH | 05.12.2001 | FI | 05.12.2001 | GR | 05.12.2001 | IT | 05.12.2001 | LI | 05.12.2001 | NL | 05.12.2001 | DK | 05.03.2002 | PT | 05.03.2002 | SE | 05.03.2002 | GB | 15.05.2002 | IE | 15.05.2002 | LU | 15.05.2002 | MC | 15.05.2002 | ES | 27.06.2002 | [2008/07] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 05.12.2001 | |
BE | 05.12.2001 | ||
CH | 05.12.2001 | ||
FI | 05.12.2001 | ||
GR | 05.12.2001 | ||
LI | 05.12.2001 | ||
NL | 05.12.2001 | ||
DK | 05.03.2002 | ||
PT | 05.03.2002 | ||
SE | 05.03.2002 | ||
GB | 15.05.2002 | ||
IE | 15.05.2002 | ||
LU | 15.05.2002 | ||
MC | 15.05.2002 | ||
ES | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 05.12.2001 | |
BE | 05.12.2001 | ||
CH | 05.12.2001 | ||
FI | 05.12.2001 | ||
GR | 05.12.2001 | ||
LI | 05.12.2001 | ||
NL | 05.12.2001 | ||
DK | 05.03.2002 | ||
PT | 05.03.2002 | ||
SE | 05.03.2002 | ||
GB | 15.05.2002 | ||
IE | 15.05.2002 | ||
MC | 15.05.2002 | ||
ES | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 05.12.2001 | |
BE | 05.12.2001 | ||
CH | 05.12.2001 | ||
FI | 05.12.2001 | ||
GR | 05.12.2001 | ||
LI | 05.12.2001 | ||
NL | 05.12.2001 | ||
DK | 05.03.2002 | ||
PT | 05.03.2002 | ||
SE | 05.03.2002 | ||
GB | 15.05.2002 | ||
IE | 15.05.2002 | ||
MC | 15.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/29] | AT | 05.12.2001 | |
BE | 05.12.2001 | ||
CH | 05.12.2001 | ||
FI | 05.12.2001 | ||
GR | 05.12.2001 | ||
LI | 05.12.2001 | ||
NL | 05.12.2001 | ||
PT | 05.03.2002 | ||
SE | 05.03.2002 | ||
GB | 15.05.2002 | ||
IE | 15.05.2002 | ||
MC | 15.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/25] | AT | 05.12.2001 | |
BE | 05.12.2001 | ||
CH | 05.12.2001 | ||
FI | 05.12.2001 | ||
GR | 05.12.2001 | ||
LI | 05.12.2001 | ||
NL | 05.12.2001 | ||
PT | 05.03.2002 | ||
SE | 05.03.2002 | ||
GB | 15.05.2002 | ||
MC | 15.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 05.12.2001 | |
BE | 05.12.2001 | ||
CH | 05.12.2001 | ||
FI | 05.12.2001 | ||
GR | 05.12.2001 | ||
LI | 05.12.2001 | ||
NL | 05.12.2001 | ||
PT | 05.03.2002 | ||
SE | 05.03.2002 | ||
GB | 15.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 05.12.2001 | |
BE | 05.12.2001 | ||
CH | 05.12.2001 | ||
FI | 05.12.2001 | ||
GR | 05.12.2001 | ||
LI | 05.12.2001 | ||
NL | 05.12.2001 | ||
PT | 05.03.2002 | ||
SE | 05.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 05.12.2001 | |
CH | 05.12.2001 | ||
FI | 05.12.2001 | ||
GR | 05.12.2001 | ||
LI | 05.12.2001 | ||
NL | 05.12.2001 | ||
PT | 05.03.2002 | ||
SE | 05.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 05.12.2001 | |
FI | 05.12.2001 | ||
GR | 05.12.2001 | ||
LI | 05.12.2001 | ||
PT | 05.03.2002 | ||
SE | 05.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | FI | 05.12.2001 | |
GR | 05.12.2001 | ||
PT | 05.03.2002 | ||
SE | 05.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | FI | 05.12.2001 | |
PT | 05.03.2002 | ||
SE | 05.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/33] | FI | 05.12.2001 | |
SE | 05.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/27] | SE | 05.03.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH06250867 ; | [A]JPH05204692 ; | [A]WO9203787 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1,12,24 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0447577 (TANDEM COMPUTERS INC) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941207), vol. 018, no. 645, Database accession no. (P - 1839), & JP06250867 A 19940909 (NIPPON TELEGR & TELEPH CORP) [A] 1,12,24 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931124), vol. 017, no. 634, Database accession no. (P - 1649), & JP05204692 A 19930813 (NEC CORP) [A] 1,12,24 * abstract * | [A] - OZGUNER F ET AL, "A RECONFIGURABLE MULTIPROCESSOR ARCHITECTURE FOR RELIABLE CONTROL OF ROBOTIC SYSTEMS", 1985 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION, ST. LOUIS, MO, US, (19850325), pages 802 - 806, XP000647411 [A] 1-31 * abstract * * page 803, column R, line 16 - line 44; figures 1-3 * |