EP0906385 - DETERGENT COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.10.2003 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2003 | Refusal of application | published on 10.12.2003 [2003/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/14] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASKEW, Stuart, Clive 17 Mayfair Road, West Jesmond Newcastle upon Tyne NE2 3DN / GB | 02 /
SORRIE, Graham, Alexander 14 Curlew Hill, Lancaster Park Morpeth, Northumberland NE61 3SH / GB | [1999/14] | Representative(s) | Peet, Jillian Wendy Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/27] | Peet, Jillian Wendy Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Whitley Road, Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | ||
Former [2002/43] | Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1999/14] | Peet, Jillian Wendy, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Whitley Road, Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 97926620.2 | 16.05.1997 | [1999/14] | WO1997US08544 | Priority number, date | US19960017884P | 17.05.1996 Original published format: US 17884 P | US19960017883P | 17.05.1996 Original published format: US 17883 P | US19960017886P | 17.05.1996 Original published format: US 17886 P | GB19960016076 | 31.07.1996 Original published format: GB 9616076 | GB19970005824 | 20.03.1997 Original published format: GB 9705824 | [1999/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9743366 | Date: | 20.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0906385 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.11.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/62, C11D3/10, C11D7/08, C11D1/65 | [1999/23] | CPC data not yet available |
Former IPC [1999/14] | C11D1/62, C11D3/10, C11D7/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/14] | Title | German: | WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [1999/14] | English: | DETERGENT COMPOSITION | [1999/14] | French: | COMPOSITION DETERGENTE | [1999/14] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.1998 | Search fee paid | 07.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/14] | 08.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.06.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2003/50] | 11.07.2003 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.07.2003 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2003/50] | Request for further processing for: | 19.12.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 30.12.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.01.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0495257 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,13-15,17-19,21 * page 2, line 3 - line 5 * * page 4, line 26 - line 30; example XII * [A] 4; | [A]WO9218596 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-4,7-12,14-21 * page 2, line 23 - line 31 * * page 6, line 22 - page 7, line 6; example -; claims 1,7 *; | [DA]EP0534525 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [DA] 1,3,4,14-21 * page 2, line 18 - line 50 ** page 3, line 53 - line 54; example - * | International search | [Y]US4220562 (MCRITCHIE ALLAN C [GB], et al); | [Y]US4240920 (DE LUQUE MANUEL J [DE]); | [Y]US4259217 (MURPHY ALAN P); | [Y]US4321157 (HARRIS RICHARD G, et al); | [Y]US4333862 (SMITH RORY J M, et al); | [Y]US4597898 (VANDER MEER JAMES M [US]) |