EP0900241 - SILYL LINKER FOR SOLID PHASE ORGANIC SYNTHESIS OF ARYL-CONTAINING MOLECULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 22.03.2006 [2006/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/05] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | ||
Former [1999/10] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEWLANDER, Kenneth, A. 911 Sage Road West Chester, PA 19382 / US | 02 /
MOORE, Michael, L. 417 South Jackson Street Media, PA 19063 / US | [1999/10] | Representative(s) | Blakey, Alison Jane, et al GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property Two New Horizons Court Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/10] | Blakey, Alison Jane, et al Smithkline Beecham, Corporate Intellectual Property, Two New Horizons Court Brentford, Middlesex, TW8 9EP / GB | Application number, filing date | 97926629.3 | 20.05.1997 | [1999/10] | WO1997US08557 | Priority number, date | US19960017955P | 20.05.1996 Original published format: US 17955 P | [1999/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9744367 | Date: | 27.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0900241 | Date: | 10.03.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0900241 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.11.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/30, C08F8/42, C08G65/32 | [2002/41] | CPC: |
C08F8/42 (EP,US);
C07F7/081 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F8/42, C08F12/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/10] | C08F8/30 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1999/10] | Title | German: | SILYL-LINKER FÜR DIE ORGANISCHE SYNTHESE IN FESTER PHASE VON ARYLGRUPPEN ENTHALTENDEN MOLEKÜLEN | [1999/13] | English: | SILYL LINKER FOR SOLID PHASE ORGANIC SYNTHESIS OF ARYL-CONTAINING MOLECULES | [1999/10] | French: | LIEUR A BASE DE SILYLE POUR LA SYNTHESE ORGANIQUE EN PHASE SOLIDE DE MOLECULES CONTENANT DE L'ARYLE | [1999/10] |
Former [1999/10] | SILYLKUPPLUNG FÜR ORGANISCHE FESTPHASENSYNTHESE VON ARYL ENTHALTENDEN MOLEKÜLEN | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.1998 | Search fee paid | 17.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/10] | 22.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 28.01.2004 | LI | 28.01.2004 | NL | 28.01.2004 | [2006/12] |
Former [2004/44] | CH | 28.01.2004 | |
LI | 28.01.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]WO9516712 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [DA] 1 * claims 1-26 *; | [A]EP0464852 (MERRELL DOW PHARMA [US]) [A] 1 * claims 1-18 * | International search | [A]US4933391 (LONG TIMOTHY E [US], et al); | [A]US4912170 (NIWA TADASHI [JP], et al) |