EP0848862 - ANTENNA ARRAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kathrein-Werke KG Anton-Kathrein-Strasse 1-3 83022 Rosenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/26] | For all designated states Kathrein-Werke KG Anton-Kathrein-Strasse 1-3 83022 Rosenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GABRIEL, Roland Rosenheimer Strasse 2a D-83109 Grosskarolinenfeld / DE | 02 /
GÖTTL, Max Aiblinger Strasse 1 D-83109 Grosskarolinenfeld / DE | 03 /
KLINGER, Georg Maulfurth 3 D-83416 Saaldorf-Surheim / DE | [2002/16] |
Former [1998/26] | 01 /
GABRIEL, Roland Rosenheimer Strasse 2a D-83109 Gro karolinenfeld / DE | ||
02 /
GÖTTL, Max Aiblinger Strasse 1 D-83109 Gro karolinenfeld / DE | |||
03 /
KLINGER, Georg Maulfurth 3 D-83416 Saaldorf-Surheim / DE | Representative(s) | Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, et al Andrae l Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Adlzreiterstrasse 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, et al Andrae Flach Haug Adlzreiterstrasse 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | ||
Former [1998/26] | Flach, Dieter Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Andrae Flach Haug Kneissl Bauer Schneider, Prinzregentenstrasse 24 83022 Rosenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 97927140.0 | 05.06.1997 | [1998/26] | WO1997EP02922 | Priority number, date | DE1996127015 | 04.07.1996 Original published format: DE 19627015 | [1998/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9801923 | Date: | 15.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0848862 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0848862 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q21/24 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
H01Q1/523 (EP,KR,US);
H01Q21/24 (EP,KR,US);
H01Q21/26 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/26] | H01Q21/12 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, SE [1998/26] | Title | German: | ANTENNENARRAY | [1998/26] | English: | ANTENNA ARRAY | [1998/26] | French: | RESEAU D'ANTENNES | [1998/26] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.1998 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/26] | 03.12.1998 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 08.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 17.07.2002 | [2003/46] | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0685900 (ALAN DICK & COMPANY LIMITED [GB]) [A] 1-17; | [A]US3541559 (EVANS GARY E) [A] 1-17; | [A]DE4302905 (KATHREIN WERKE KG [DE]) [A] 1-17 |