EP0912791 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR UNLOADING ITEMS OF WASHING FROM A TREATMENT MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.09.2001 [2001/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Engel, Gerhard Weststrasse 12 74363 Güglingen / DE | [1999/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/18] | Representative(s) | Kastner, Hermann Patentanwalt Rieslingweg 5 71720 Oberstenfeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | Kastner, Hermann, Dipl.-Ing., Patentanwalt Rieslingweg 5 71720 Oberstenfeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 97927167.3 | 10.06.1997 | [1999/18] | WO1997EP03017 | Priority number, date | DE1996125707 | 27.06.1996 Original published format: DE 19625707 | [1999/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9800598 | Date: | 08.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0912791 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0912791 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | D06F95/00 | [1999/18] | CPC: |
D06F95/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1999/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUM ENTLADEN VON WÄSCHESTÜCKEN AUS EINER BEARBEITUNGSMASCHINE | [1999/18] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR UNLOADING ITEMS OF WASHING FROM A TREATMENT MACHINE | [1999/18] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR SORTIR DU LINGE D'UNE MACHINE DE TRAITEMENT | [1999/18] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.1998 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.10.1998 | Examination requested [1999/18] | 23.02.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 23.03.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.03.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 05.04.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB467594 (STANLEY NEWBERY, et al) [A] 1-4,9-12 * page 6, line 14 - line 37 * * page 6, line 109 - line 117; figure 2 *; | [A]DE1915990 (KRANTZ H FA) [A] 1-4,9-12 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0343096 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-4,9-12 * column 47, line 38 - line 62; figures 24,25; claims 7,8 *; | [A]US5060399 (ENGEL GERHARD [DE]) |