EP0918990 - AN ASSAY WHICH MEASURES PHOSPHATIDYLINOSITOL 3,4,5 TRISPHOSPHATE MASS AT HIGH SENSITIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.08.2000 [2000/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Dundee Dundee DD1 4HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/22] | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF DUNDEE Dundee DD1 4HN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOWNES, Peter Charles, University of Dundee Dept. of Biochemistry, Medical Sciences Institute Dundee DD1 4HN / GB | 02 /
BATTY, Ian Howard, University of Dundee Dept. of Biochemistry, Medical Science Institute Dundee DD1 4HN / GB | 03 /
VAN DER KAAY, Jeroen, University of Dundee Dept. of Biochemistry, Medical Sciences Institute Dundee DD1 4HN / GB | [1999/22] | Representative(s) | Miles, John Stephen, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/22] | Miles, John Stephen, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 97927287.9 | 23.06.1997 | [1999/22] | WO1997GB01673 | Priority number, date | GB19960013107 | 21.06.1996 Original published format: GB 9613107 | [1999/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9749990 | Date: | 31.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/57] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0918990 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/50, G01N33/53, G01N33/60 | [1999/22] | CPC: |
G01N33/60 (EP);
G01N33/5308 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/22] | Title | German: | PHOSPHATIDYLINOSITOL 3,4,5 TRIPHOSPHAT BESTIMMUNG | [1999/22] | English: | AN ASSAY WHICH MEASURES PHOSPHATIDYLINOSITOL 3,4,5 TRISPHOSPHATE MASS AT HIGH SENSITIVITY | [1999/22] | French: | DOSAGE SERVANT A MESURER AVEC UNE HAUTE PRECISION LA MASSE DU PHOSPHATIDYLINOSITOL 3,4,5 TRISPHOSPHATE | [1999/22] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/22] | 16.06.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4863874 (WASSEF NABILA M ET AL) [A] 1,15,20,21,33,36,37 * the whole document *; | [PX] - J. VAN DER KAAY ET AL, "A novel, rapid, and highly sensitive mass assay for phosphatidylinositol 3,4,5-trisphosphate (PtdIns(3,4,5)P3) and its application to measure insulin-stimulated PtdIns(3,4,5)P3 production in rat skeletal muscle in vivo.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, MD US, (19970228), vol. 272, no. 9, pages 5477 - 5481, XP002045260 [PX] 1-37 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.272.9.5477 | [A] - C. A. ALTER & B. A. WOLF, "Identification of phosphatidylinositol 3,4,5-trisphosphate in pancreatic islets and insulin-secreting beta-cell.", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ORLANDO, FL US, (19950308), vol. 208, no. 1, pages 190 - 197, XP002045261 [A] 1,15,20,21,33,36,37 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1995.1322 | [A] - R. STRICKER ET AL, "Determination of specificity of a high-affinity inositol 1,3,4,5-tetrakisphosphate binding site at a 42 kDa receptor protein, p42(ip4): comparison of affinities of all inositoltris-, tetrakis-, and -pentakisphosphate regiosomers.", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ORLANDO, FL US, (1996), vol. 228, no. 2, pages 596 - 604, XP002045262 [A] 1,15,20,21,33,36,37 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1996.1703 |