EP0867227 - NOZZLE STRUCTURE FOR ATOMIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2005 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.08.2005 [2005/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Earth Chemical Co., Ltd. 9, Tsukasa-cho 2-chome, Kanda Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/40] | For all designated states EARTH CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 9, Tsukasa-cho 2-chome, Kanda Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITABAYASHI, Seiichi 919-12, Oaza Koshikiya Ageo-shi Saitama 362 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI, Naoki 1108-2, Fujikubo Miyoshimachi Iruma-gun Saitama 354 / JP | [1998/40] | Representative(s) | Whitten, George Alan, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/40] | Whitten, George Alan, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co., 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97927416.4 | 23.06.1997 | [1998/40] | WO1997JP02143 | Priority number, date | JP19960200907 | 27.06.1996 Original published format: JP 20090796 | JP19960263417 | 29.08.1996 Original published format: JP 26341796 | [1998/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9749498 | Date: | 31.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/57] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0867227 | Date: | 30.09.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0867227 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.12.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B05B9/04, B05B1/16, B65D83/14 | [1998/40] | CPC: |
B05B1/3026 (EP,US);
B05B9/04 (KR);
B05B1/16 (KR);
B05B1/1645 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87804 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | ES, GB [1998/40] | Title | German: | ZERSTÄUBUNGSDÜSENSTRUKTUR | [1998/40] | English: | NOZZLE STRUCTURE FOR ATOMIZATION | [1998/40] | French: | STRUCTURE DE BUSE DE PULVERISATION | [1998/40] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.1998 | Translation filed | 24.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.1998 | Search fee paid | 24.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: EURO-PCT translation(s) not filed | 24.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/40] | 12.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US150376 (E. TOMLINSON) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0245822 (JOHNSON & SON INC S C [US]) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * figure - *; | [A]US4850540 (TANIGUCHI SHOICHI [JP]) [A] 1-3 * abstract * | International search | [P]JPH08253277 (KITABAYASHI SEIICHI, et al); | [A]JPH0364276U | by applicant | JPS5313805U |