EP0979474 - SYSTEM AND PROCESS FOR PRICING FINANCIAL INSTRUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.04.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 07.05.2014 [2014/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CITIBANK, N.A. 399 Park Avenue New York New York 10043 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/07] | For all designated states CITIBANK, N.A. 399 Park Avenue New York, New York 10043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOTTESMAN, Sidney 144-05 Jewel Avenue Flushing, NY 11367 / US | 02 /
SHUMAN, Darlene, S. 8 Stonebridge Lane Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | 03 /
ELETTO, Patricia, Ann 2265 Gerritsen Avenue nr. 6M Brooklyn, NY 11229 / US | 04 /
GURDUS, Benjamin 10 Manchester Drive Westfield, NJ 07090 / US | 05 /
SANTARIELLO, Robert 234 Bay 23rd Street Brooklyn, NY 11214 / US | 06 /
MURTHY, Jay 1553 Wilson Road Weast Meadow, NY 11554 / US | 07 /
SPIVAK, Michael 15 Maytime Court Jericho, NY 11753 / US | [2000/07] | Representative(s) | Johansson, Lars-Erik, et al Hynell Intellectual Property AB Hammarbybacken 27 120 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Johansson, Lars-Erik, et al Hynell Patenttjänst AB Patron Carls väg 2 683 40 Hagfors / Uddeholm / SE | ||
Former [2002/51] | Johansson, Lars E., et al Hynell Patenttjänst AB Patron Carls Väg 2 683 40 Hagfors/Uddeholm / SE | ||
Former [2000/07] | Hynell, Magnus Hynell Patenttjänst AB, Patron Carls väg 2 683 40 Hagfors/Uddeholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 97927749.8 | 30.05.1997 | [2000/07] | WO1997US08881 | Priority number, date | US19960655924 | 31.05.1996 Original published format: US 655924 | [2000/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9745803 | Date: | 04.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0979474 | Date: | 16.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.12.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2005/17] | CPC: |
G06Q40/02 (EP,US);
G06Q20/10 (EP,US);
G06Q20/102 (EP,US);
G06Q20/108 (EP,US);
G06Q40/03 (EP,US);
G06Q40/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/07] | G06F17/60, G06G7/52 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/07] | Extension states | AL | 16.10.1998 | LT | 16.10.1998 | LV | 16.10.1998 | RO | 16.10.1998 | SI | 16.10.1998 | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND PROZESS ZUM BEPREISEN VON FINANZIELLEN INSTRUMENTEN | [2000/07] | English: | SYSTEM AND PROCESS FOR PRICING FINANCIAL INSTRUMENTS | [2000/07] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE TARIFICATION DES CHARGES POUR PRESTATIONS BANCAIRES | [2000/07] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.1998 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.1998 | Search fee paid | 16.10.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.10.1998 | Examination requested [2000/07] | 28.07.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/19] | 23.03.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.03.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/19] | Appeal following examination | 19.05.2009 | Appeal received No. T1597/09 | 13.07.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.03.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.09.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 20.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 16.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3017103 (JACOB GOLDBERG, et al) [X] 1-14 * column 2, line 68 - column 5, line 15; figure 2; claims 1,12 *; | [X]US4752877 (ROBERTS PETER A [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * column 2, line 3 - column 3, line 68; claims 1-3 *; | [Y]US4774663 (MUSMANNO THOMAS E [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * column 2, line 4 - column 3, line 43; figures 1-4; claims 9,11 * * column 10, line 59 - column 12, line 5 *; | [Y]US5206803 (VITAGLIANO FRANCIS M [US], et al) [Y] 1-14* column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 51; figure 1; claim 1 * | International search | [A] - AMERICAN BANKER, 29 July 1987, Vol. 152, No. 147, SULLIVAN, MICHAEL P., "Financial Marketing Issues Rate High on Effort, Low on Delivery", p. 4. | [A] - BANK RATE MONITOR, 24 December 1990, Vol. 9, No. 2, "CoreStates Hikes Loan Discounts", pp. 1 and 8. | [A] - BANK ADVERTISING NEWS, 23 September 1991, Vol. 16, No. 3, "First Union Sets Strategy After Southeast Buy", pp. 1 and 5. | [A] - THE JOURNAL OF COMMERCIAL LENDING, March 1992, FERRARI, RICHARD H., "Commercial Loan Pricing and Profitability Analysis Part II", pp. 35-46. | [A] - JOURNAL OF COMMERCIAL LENDING, December 1995, Vol. 78, No. 4, CHMURA, CHRISTINE, "A Loan Pricing Case Study", p. 23-33. | other | US3107103 | US5557798 | US5644727 | US5649181 | US5649116 | US5659165 | WO9745803 | US5710889 |