EP0906624 - NUCLEAR FUEL ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.07.2001 [2001/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB ATOM AB 721 63 Västeras / SE | [1999/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NYLUND, Olov Ragnaröksgatan 17 S-720 17 Västeras / SE | 02 /
SAHLIN, Thorbjörn Diskusgatan 95 S-722 40 Västeras / SE | [1999/14] | Representative(s) | Bornegård, Annette, et al Asea Brown Boveri AB Patent 721 78 Västeras / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/14] | Sjöholm, Annette, et al Asea Brown Boveri AB Patent 721 78 Västeras / SE | Application number, filing date | 97928610.1 | 18.06.1997 | [1999/14] | WO1997SE01083 | Priority number, date | SE19960002454 | 20.06.1996 Original published format: SE 9602454 | [1999/14] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9749093 | Date: | 24.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/55] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0906624 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 24.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G21C3/18, // G21C3/16 | [1999/14] | CPC: |
G21C3/336 (EP);
Y02E30/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FI, LI, SE [1999/14] | Title | German: | KERNBRENNSTABBÜNDEL | [1999/14] | English: | NUCLEAR FUEL ASSEMBLY | [1999/14] | French: | ENSEMBLE A COMBUSTIBLE NUCLEAIRE | [1999/14] | Entry into regional phase | 24.12.1998 | Translation filed | 12.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 12.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/14] | 03.01.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/29] | 31.01.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB1403491 (SIEMENS AG); | [Y]JP01083189 ; | [Y]CH442544 (CA ATOMIC ENERGY LTD [CA]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 13, No. 314, P-899; & JP,A,01 083 189 (MITSUBISHI NUCLEAR FUEL CO LTD), 28 March 1989., & JP01083189 A 19890328 |