EP0979484 - METHOD FOR INDEXING IMAGE INFORMATION USING A REFERENCE MODEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sarnoff Corporation 201 Washington Road, CN 5300 Princeton, NJ 08543-5300 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/07] | For all designated states Sarnoff Corporation 201 Washington Road, CN 5300 Princeton, NJ 08543-5300 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IRANI, Michal 11B Landing Lane Princeton Junction, NJ 08550 / US | 02 /
PELEG, Shmuel 130 Moore Street Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | 03 /
ANANDAN, Padmanabhan B-2 Carver Place Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 / US | [2000/07] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | ||
Former [2007/17] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford & Co 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | ||
Former [2000/07] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97929002.0 | 16.06.1997 | [2000/07] | WO1997US10534 | Priority number, date | US19960663582 | 14.06.1996 Original published format: US 663582 | [2000/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9748068 | Date: | 18.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/54] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0979484 | Date: | 16.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.12.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06F17/30 | [2003/40] | CPC: |
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
G06F16/71 (EP,US);
G06F16/739 (EP,US);
G06F16/786 (EP,US);
G11B27/102 (EP,US);
G11B27/28 (EP,US);
G11B27/34 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/07] | G06K9/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM INDEXIEREN VON BILDINFORMATIONEN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES REFERENZMODELS | [2000/07] | English: | METHOD FOR INDEXING IMAGE INFORMATION USING A REFERENCE MODEL | [2000/07] | French: | PROCEDE D'INDEXATION DE DONNEES D'IMAGES UTILISANT UN MODELE DE REFERENCE | [2000/07] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.1998 | Search fee paid | 11.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.12.1998 | Examination requested [2000/07] | 17.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/42] | 18.05.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 30.05.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - TONOMURA Y ET AL, "VIDEOMAP AND VIDEOSPACELCON: TOOLS FOR ANATOMIZING VIDEO CONTENT", BRIDGES BETWEEN WORLDS. AMSTERDAM, APR. 24 - 29, 1993, PROCEEDINGS OF THE CONFERENCE ON HUMAN FACTORS IN COMPUTING SYSTEMS. (INTERCHI), READING, ADDISON WESLEY, US, (19930424), pages 131 - 136, XP000473758 [X] 1-10 * page 133 - page 135 * | [X] - SHENCHANG ERIC CHEN, "QuickTime VR: an image-based approach to virtual environment navigation", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 22ND ANNUAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER GRAPHICS AND INTERACTIVE TECHNIQUES, Los Angeles, USA, (19950806), pages 29 - 38, URL: http://delivery.acm.org/10.1145/220000/218395/p29-chen.pdf?key1=218395&key2=0126430601&coll=portal&dl=ACM&CFID=2181828&CFTOKEN=68827537, (20030808), XP002250814 [X] 1-10 * page 29 * * page 32 - page 35 * | [A] - TEODOSIO L ET AL, "SALIENT VIDEO STILLS: CONTENT AND CONTEXT PRESERVED", PROCEEDINGS OF FIRST ACM INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MULTIMEDIA, 2-6 AUGUST 1993, ANAHEIM, CA, US, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19930801), pages 39 - 46, XP000670793 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/166266.166270 | International search | [A]US4672683 (MATSUEDA AKIRA [JP]); | [A]US5388197 (RAYNER BRUCE L [US]); | [AP]US5572726 (HASUO KAMON [JP]); | [AP]US5586197 (TSUJIMURA KAZUKO [JP], et al) |