EP0916029 - DEVICE FOR SECURING TWO COMPONENTS ARRANGED AT AN ANGLE WITH RESPECT TO EACH OTHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2001 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.07.2001 [2001/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1999/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUENNING, Torsten Uhlandstrasse 80 D-70736 Fellbach / DE | [1999/20] | Application number, filing date | 97929092.1 | 07.06.1997 | [1999/20] | WO1997DE01148 | Priority number, date | DE1996213526U | 05.08.1996 Original published format: DE 29613526 U | [1999/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9805873 | Date: | 12.02.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0916029 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16B7/18 | [1999/20] | CPC: |
F16B7/18 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI [1999/20] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEFESTIGUNG VON ZWEI UNTER EINEM WINKEL ZUEINANDER ANGEORDNETEN BAUTEILEN | [1999/20] | English: | DEVICE FOR SECURING TWO COMPONENTS ARRANGED AT AN ANGLE WITH RESPECT TO EACH OTHER | [1999/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION DE DEUX COMPOSANTS PLACES L'UN PAR RAPPORT A L'AUTRE DE FA ON A FORMER UN ANGLE | [1999/20] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/20] | 22.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/27] | 26.01.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0136264 (ALUSUISSE [CH]) [X] 1-3,5-7,9 * page 4, line 11 - page 5, line 3; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0694701 (ALUSUISSE LONZA SERVICES AG [CH]) [A] 1 * column 10, line 6 - line 26; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0331865 (VAW VER ALUMINIUM WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * |