EP0904336 - METHOD OF PREPARING LOW-SULPHUR ALIPHATIC COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2002 Database last updated on 11.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [1999/13] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VICARI, Maximilian Paul-Münch-Strasse 6 D-67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 02 /
SCHWAB, Ekkehard Berwartsteinstrasse 4 D-67434 Neustadt / DE | 03 /
WALTER, Marc Hans-Holbein-Strasse 5d D-67227 Frankenthal / DE | 04 /
MAASSEN, Siegmar Lisztstrasse 168 D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2001/06] |
Former [1999/13] | 01 /
VICARI, Maximilian Paul-Münch-Strasse 6 D-67117 Limburgerhof / DE | ||
02 /
SCHWAB, Ekkehard Berwartsteinstrasse 4 D-67434 Neustadt / DE | |||
03 /
WALTER, Marc Hans-Holbein-Strasse 5a D-67227 Frankenthal / DE | |||
04 /
MAASSEN, Siegmar Lisztstrasse 168 D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | Representative(s) | Kinzebach, Werner, et al Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 21 11 60 67011 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | Kinzebach, Werner, Dr., et al Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner, Postfach 21 11 60 67011 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 97929158.0 | 10.06.1997 | [1999/13] | WO1997EP03008 | Priority number, date | DE1996123291 | 11.06.1996 Original published format: DE 19623291 | [1999/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9747707 | Date: | 18.12.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/54] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0904336 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0904336 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C10G21/20 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
C10G21/20 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL, PT, SE [1999/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SCHWEFELARMEN ALIPHATISCHEN VERBINDUNGEN | [1999/13] | English: | METHOD OF PREPARING LOW-SULPHUR ALIPHATIC COMPOUNDS | [1999/13] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE COMPOSES ALIPHATIQUES A FAIBLE TENEUR EN SOUFRE | [1999/13] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/13] | 29.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.02.2001 | Request for decision received: (all rights) | 21.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2001 | Result of request for decision ((all rights)): Request granted | 09.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2003/21] | FR | 25.01.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1591367 (BASF); | [Y]DE2014262 (KOPPERS) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE2040025 (KOPPERS GMBH HEINRICH); | [A]EP0073945 (KRUPP KOPPERS GMBH [DE]); | [Y]EP0538738 (GEN SEKIYU KABUSHIKI KAISHA [JP]) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0653477 (GEN SEKIYU KABUSHIKI KAISHA [JP]) |