EP0934551 - LASER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.08.2003 [2003/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QinetiQ Limited 85 Buckingham Gate London, SW1 6TD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/38] | For all designated states QinetiQ Limited 85 Buckingham Gate London, SW1 6TD / GB | ||
Former [1999/32] | For all designated states The Secretary of State for Defence in Her Britannic Majesty's Government of The United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern I reland, Whitehall London SW1A 2HB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAWBER, William Dera Portsdown West Portsdown Hill Road Fareham Hampshire PO17 6AD / GB | 02 /
WANG, Jian National Physical Laboratory, Queens Road Teddington, Middlesex TW11 OLW / GB | 03 /
DUNN, Malcolm, Harry University of St Andrews North Haugh St Andrews Fife KY16 9SS / GB | 04 /
RAE, Cameron, Francis University of St Andrews North Haugh St Andrews Fife KY16 9SS / GB | [1999/32] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2001/38] |
Former [1999/32] | Bowdery, Anthony Oliver, et al D/IPD DERA Formalities A4 Building Ively Road Farnborough, Hants. GU14 OLX / GB | Application number, filing date | 97929383.4 | 26.06.1997 | [1999/32] | WO1997GB01747 | Priority number, date | GB19960015830 | 13.07.1996 Original published format: GB 9615830 | [1999/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9802777 | Date: | 22.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0934551 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0934551 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/39, G01N21/47 | [1999/32] | CPC: |
G02F1/39 (EP,US);
G01N21/4795 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/51] |
Former [1999/32] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | LASERVORRICHTUNG | [1999/32] | English: | LASER DEVICE | [1999/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF LASER | [1999/32] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/32] | 20.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH08128949 ; | [XY]EP0604303 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [X] 1-9 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 41; figure 4 * [Y] 10,11; | [Y]US5465147 (SWANSON ERIC A [US]) [Y] 10 * abstract * * column 8, line 7 - line 19 *; | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960930), vol. 096, no. 009, & JP08128949 A 19960521 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND CO LTD;ISHIKAWAJIMA SHIBAURA MACH CO LTD) [Y] 11 * abstract * | [PX] - WANG J ET AL, "Polychromatic optical parametric generation by simultaneous phase matching over a large spectral bandwidth", OPTICS LETTERS, 1 JUNE 1997, OPT. SOC. AMERICA, USA, ISSN 0146-9592, vol. 22, no. 11, pages 763 - 765, XP002043138 [PX] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.22.000763 | [A] - TRAPANI DI P ET AL, "EFFICIENT CONVERSION OF FEMTOSECOND BLUE PULSES BY TRAVELLING-WAVE PARAMETRIC GENERATION IN NON-COLLINEA PHASE MATCHING", OPTICS COMMUNICATIONS, (19950901), vol. 119, no. 3/04, pages 327 - 332, XP000518530 [A] 1,3-9 * paragraphs [0002] - [0003] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0030-4018(95)00349-D | [A] - AGNESI A ET AL, "beta -Barium borate and lithium triborate picosecond parametric oscillators pumped by a frequency-tripled passive negative-feedback mode-locked Nd:YAG laser", JOURNAL OF THE OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA B (OPTICAL PHYSICS), NOV. 1993, USA, ISSN 0740-3224, vol. 10, no. 11, pages 2211 - 2217, XP002043139 [A] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - KRYLOV V ET AL, "Noncollinear parametric generation in LiIO/sub 3/ and beta -barium borate by frequency-doubled femtosecond Ti:sapphire laser pulses", OPTICS LETTERS, 15 JAN. 1995, USA, ISSN 0146-9592, vol. 20, no. 2, pages 151 - 153, XP002043140 [A] 1 * page 153 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.20.000151 |