EP0938340 - METHOD FOR PREPARING BIOACTIVE POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.03.2003 [2003/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAR ILAN UNIVERSITY P.O. Box 1530 52900 Ramat Gan / IL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/35] | For all designated states Bar Ilan University P.O. Box 1530 52900 Ramat Gan / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARGEL, Shlomo HaBaal-Shem-Tov Street 14 76210 Rehovot / IL | 02 /
BURDYGIN, Irene Aliyah Street 6/10 48590 Rosh Ha'ayin / IL | [1999/35] | Representative(s) | Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew Kilburn & Strode LLP Lancon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/35] | Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew Stephenson Harwood One, St. Paul's Churchyard London EC4M 8SH / GB | Application number, filing date | 97929483.2 | 14.07.1997 | [1999/35] | WO1997IL00239 | Priority number, date | IL19960118848 | 14.07.1996 Original published format: IL 11884896 | [1999/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9802189 | Date: | 22.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0938340 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/48 | [1999/35] | CPC: |
A61K47/61 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1999/35] | Title | German: | PROTEIN-POLYHYDROXYPOLYMER-KONJUGATE MIT WUNDHEILENDER WIRKUNG | [1999/35] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARING BIOACTIVE POLYMERS | [1999/35] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE POLYMERES BIOACTIFS | [1999/35] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/35] | 25.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/11] | 11.10.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH04183392 ; | [X]GB1257263 (AVRAMEAS STRATIS ET AL) [X] 1-6,9-13,15-25,27-34 * page 2 * * page 3, lines 10-55 * * page 4, lines 25-85; examples 9,10; claims 1,2,5,10-13,20,22 *; | [X]WO9006767 (JOLLA CANCER RES FOUND [US]) [X] 1-9,14-16,18-29,31-34 * abstract * * page 9; examples 4-7,9; claims 5,8-10,18,19 *; | [X]US4970156 (AVRAMEAS STATIS [FR], et al) [X] 1-5,9-13,15-24,27,28,30-34 * abstract * * column 12, lines 15-48 *; | [X]EP0611573 (UNIV BAR ILAN [IL]) [X] 1-16,20-32 * abstract * * the whole document * * examples 1,3,5,12,14 * * examples 21,24,27; claims 4-9 * * examples 31,32 *; | [X]WO9515352 (UNIV QUEBEC MONTREAL [CA]) [X] 1,6,9-13,15-17,20,25,27,28,30-32 * abstract * * page 7 * * page 11, lines 5-25 * * page 12, line 15 - page 13; table 1 * * page 16, lines 5-20 * * page 25, lines 5-25; table 5 * * claims 1,3,13,16,17 *; | [X]EP0680990 (COLLAGEN CORP [US]) [X] 1-9,14-16,18-29,31-34 * page 7, lines 35-58 * * page 8, lines 45-56 * * page 14, lines 50-58 * * page 15, lines 45-55 * * page 16, paragraph 1 * * page 17, paragraph 2 * * page 18, lines 40-55 * * page 19, paragraph 3; claims 1,5-7,12,16,17 * * claims 25,40,41,49,55 *; | [XD]WO9615236 (UNIV BAR ILAN [IL], et al) [XD] 1-6,9-16,18-25,27-29,31-34 * page 24 - page 25; claims 13,17-26; table 1 * * page 19, lines 5-7 * * pages 9-11; examples 1,8-15,20 * * abstract * * the whole document *; | [X] - BETHELL G S ET AL, "INVESTIGATION OF THE ACTIVATION OF VARIOUS INSOLUBLE POLY SACCHARIDES WITH 1 1' CARBONYL DI IMIDAZOLE AND OF THE PROPERTIES OF THE ACTIVATED MATRICES", J CHROMATOGR, 219 (3). 1981 (RECD. 1982). 361-372., XP002056902 [X] 1-13 * figures 2,3; tables 1,2,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9673(00)80379-9 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921014), vol. 016, no. 496, Database accession no. (C - 0995), & JP04183392 A 19920630 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 1-14 * abstract * | [A] - HUBBELL J A, "Hydrogel systems for barriers and local drug delivery in the control of wound healing", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (199605), vol. 39, no. 2, page 305-313, XP004037336 [A] 1-34 * abstract * * page 308, column 1 * * page 309, paragraph 2 * * page 312; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-3659(95)00162-X | [L] - CUATRECASAS P, "PROTEIN PURIFICATION BY AFFINITY CHROMATOGRAPHY DERIVATIZATIONS OF AGAROSE AND POLYACRYLAMIDE BEADS", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19700625), vol. 245, no. 12, pages 3059 - 3065, XP000563603 [L] 1-34 * abstract * * page 3060 - page 3061 * | [L] - AVRAMEAS S. AND TERNYNCK T., "The crosslinking of proteins with glutaraldehide and its use for the preparation of immunoadsorbents", IMMUNOCHEMISTRY, (19680430), vol. 6, pages 53 - 66, XP002057181 [L] 1-34 * page 62 - page 64 * * page 65, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0019-2791(69)90178-5 |