EP0938293 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING LIQUID PERSONAL CLEANSING COMPOSITIONS WHICH PROVIDE ENHANCED PERFUME DEPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/35] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEI, Karl, Shiqing 4600 Cobblestone Court Mason, OH 45040 / US | 02 /
WONG, Louis, Fay 9868 Bobwhite Place Mason, OH 45040 / US | 03 /
SINE, Mark, Richard 2631 East U.S. 22 and 3 Morrow, OH 45152 / US | 04 /
COFFINDAFFER, Timothy, Woodrew 118 Bridle Lane Loveland, OH 45140 / US | 05 /
TRINH, Toan 8671 Creekwood Lane Maineville, OH 45039 / US | [1999/35] | Representative(s) | McKinney, Victoria, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centers Limited Lovett House Lovett Road Staines, Middlesex TW18 3AZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/35] | Woof, Victoria, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centers Limited, Lovett House, Lovett Road Staines, Middlesex TW18 3AZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97930064.7 | 17.06.1997 | [1999/35] | WO1997US10482 | Priority number, date | US19960667138 | 20.06.1996 Original published format: US 667138 | [1999/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9748378 | Date: | 24.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/55] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0938293 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0938293 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/50 | [1999/35] | CPC: |
A61K8/466 (EP,US);
A61K8/731 (EP,US);
A61Q13/00 (EP,US);
A61Q19/10 (EP,US);
A61K2800/5426 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FLÜSSIGEN KÖRPERREINIGUNGSMITTELN MITVERBESSERTER FREISETZUNG VON DUFTSTOFFEN | [1999/35] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING LIQUID PERSONAL CLEANSING COMPOSITIONS WHICH PROVIDE ENHANCED PERFUME DEPOSITION | [1999/35] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE COMPOSITIONS LIQUIDES POUR LE NETTOYAGE DE LA PEAU, PRODUISANT UN DEPOT DE PARFUM ACCRU | [1999/35] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/35] | 28.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.12.2001 | BE | 12.12.2001 | CH | 12.12.2001 | FI | 12.12.2001 | GR | 12.12.2001 | LI | 12.12.2001 | NL | 12.12.2001 | DK | 12.03.2002 | PT | 12.03.2002 | SE | 12.03.2002 | IE | 17.06.2002 | LU | 17.06.2002 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/46] | AT | 12.12.2001 | |
BE | 12.12.2001 | ||
CH | 12.12.2001 | ||
FI | 12.12.2001 | ||
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
LI | 12.12.2001 | ||
NL | 12.12.2001 | ||
DK | 12.03.2002 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
SE | 12.03.2002 | ||
IE | 17.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/29] | AT | 12.12.2001 | |
BE | 12.12.2001 | ||
CH | 12.12.2001 | ||
FI | 12.12.2001 | ||
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
LI | 12.12.2001 | ||
NL | 12.12.2001 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
SE | 12.03.2002 | ||
IE | 17.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 12.12.2001 | |
BE | 12.12.2001 | ||
CH | 12.12.2001 | ||
FI | 12.12.2001 | ||
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
LI | 12.12.2001 | ||
NL | 12.12.2001 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
SE | 12.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 12.12.2001 | |
CH | 12.12.2001 | ||
FI | 12.12.2001 | ||
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
LI | 12.12.2001 | ||
NL | 12.12.2001 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
SE | 12.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 12.12.2001 | |
FI | 12.12.2001 | ||
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
LI | 12.12.2001 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
SE | 12.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | FI | 12.12.2001 | |
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
SE | 12.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | FI | 12.12.2001 | |
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
SE | 12.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/33] | FI | 12.12.2001 | |
SE | 12.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/27] | SE | 12.03.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH02242899 ; | [A]GB2177108 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [A] 1,2,6 * page 1, line 51 - line 55 * * page 4, line 11 - line 13 * * page 4, line 35 - line 46 *; | [A]FR2712490 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [A] 1-3 * example 1 *; | [E]WO9725975 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [E] 1-3,7,8 * claim 1 ** page 13, line 11 - line 27 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 45, Database accession no. 90-338155, XP002045831 & JPH02242899 A 19900927 (LION CORP) [A] 1,3,7 * abstract * |