EP1025002 - METERING AND PACKAGING DEVICE FOR DRY POWDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.2004 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.2004 [2004/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abrams, Andrew L. 26 Imperial Avenue Westport, CT 06880 / US | For all designated states Gumaste, Anand 7 Ardsley Court Robbinsville, NJ 08691 / US | [2000/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/32] | Representative(s) | Audier, Philippe André, et al BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/02] | Audier, Philippe André, et al Brevalex, 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2000/32] | Des Termes, Monique, et al c/o Société de Protection des Inventions 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97930068.8 | 23.06.1997 | [2000/32] | WO1997US10494 | Priority number, date | US19960677340 | 02.07.1996 Original published format: US 677340 | [2000/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9800337 | Date: | 08.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1025002 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.01.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B65B1/30, B65B1/04 | [2002/33] | CPC: |
B65B1/04 (EP,US);
B65B1/30 (KR);
G03G15/04045 (EP,US);
G03G15/221 (EP,US);
Y10S141/01 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/32] | B65B1/30 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, SE [2000/32] | Title | German: | Dosierungs- und Verpackungsmaschine für trockenes Pulver | [2000/32] | English: | METERING AND PACKAGING DEVICE FOR DRY POWDERS | [2000/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DOSAGE ET D'EMBALLAGE POUR POUDRES SECHES | [2000/32] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.1999 | Search fee paid | 11.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.01.1999 | Examination requested [2000/32] | 20.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/19] | 05.12.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US3241625 (SOOJIAN VAHN J) [Y] 1,3-6,8-11 * column 2, line 46 - column 5, line 9; figure 1 * * the whole document * [A] 2,7; | [A]US4021587 (BANKER HAROLD J) [A] 1-11* abstract *; | [YA]WO8400705 (BAXTER TRAVENOL LAB [US]) [Y] 1,3-6,8-11 * page 5, line 21 - page 6, line 31; figure 1 * * the whole document * [A] 2,7 | International search | [A]US3241625 (SOOJIAN VAHN J); | [A]US3437074 (HAGOPIAN JACOB J, et al); | [A]US4021587 (BANKER HAROLD J); | [A]US4170287 (ANGELUCCI RICHARD J [US], et al); | [A]US4252434 (NAKAMURA SHUNJI, et al); | [A]US4555174 (KRAMER GEORGE J [US]); | [A]US4848267 (SLAYTON DANNY L [US], et al) |