EP0910597 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING CELLULAR POLYURETHANE ELASTOMERS BASED ON 3,3'-DIMETHOXY-4,4'DIISOCYANATO-DIPHENYL AND/OR 4,4'-STILBENE-DIISOCYANATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [1999/17] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GENZ, Manfred Friedhofstrasse 1a D-49401 Damme / DE | 02 /
MERGER, Roland Blumenstrasse 15 D-76669 Bad Schönborn / DE | 03 /
BOLLMANN, Heinz Heeker Strasse 82 D-49594 Alfhausen / DE | 04 /
THÄRIGEN, Raina Vogelsangweg 24 D-49086 Osnabrück / DE | 05 /
VOELKEL, Rüdiger Schannenbacher Weg 2 D-64625 Bensheim / DE | 06 /
KRAUS, Rupert Berliner Strasse 6 D-67165 Waldsee / DE | 07 /
POHL, Siegmund Jahnstrasse 33 D-67069 Ludwigshafen / DE | [1999/17] | Application number, filing date | 97930439.1 | 30.06.1997 | [1999/17] | WO1997EP03395 | Priority number, date | DE1996128146 | 12.07.1996 Original published format: DE 19628146 | DE1996128145 | 12.07.1996 Original published format: DE 19628145 | [1999/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9802477 | Date: | 22.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0910597 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0910597 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/81, C08G18/77, C08G18/76, C08G18/66 | [1999/17] | CPC: |
C08J9/141 (EP);
C08G18/10 (EP);
C08G18/4238 (EP);
C08G18/4891 (EP);
C08G18/771 (EP);
C08G18/8125 (EP);
C08J9/00 (EP);
C08G2110/0008 (EP);
C08G2110/0066 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/36 (EP);
C08G18/10, C08G18/38 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1999/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ZELLIGEN POLYURETHAN-ELASTOMEREN AUF BASIS VON 3,3'-DIMETHOXY-4,4'-DIISOCYANATO-DIPHENYL UND/ODER 4,4'-STILBENDIISOCYANAT | [1999/17] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING CELLULAR POLYURETHANE ELASTOMERS BASED ON 3,3'-DIMETHOXY-4,4'DIISOCYANATO-DIPHENYL AND/OR 4,4'-STILBENE-DIISOCYANATE | [1999/17] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'ELASTOMERES CELLULAIRES DE POLYURETHANNE A BASE DE 3,3'-DIMETHOXY-4,4'-DIISOCYANATO-DIPHENYLE ET/OU DE 4,4'-STILBENE-DIISOCYANATE | [1999/17] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/17] | 04.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 06.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 16.05.2001 | FR | 16.05.2001 | GB | 16.05.2001 | IT | 16.05.2001 | NL | 16.05.2001 | AT | 30.06.2001 | BE | 30.06.2001 | CH | 30.06.2001 | LI | 30.06.2001 | DK | 16.08.2001 | PT | 16.08.2001 | SE | 16.08.2001 | ES | 30.11.2001 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/14] | FI | 16.05.2001 | |
FR | 16.05.2001 | ||
GB | 16.05.2001 | ||
NL | 16.05.2001 | ||
AT | 30.06.2001 | ||
BE | 30.06.2001 | ||
CH | 30.06.2001 | ||
LI | 30.06.2001 | ||
DK | 16.08.2001 | ||
PT | 16.08.2001 | ||
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
ES | 30.11.2001 | ||
Former [2004/04] | FI | 16.05.2001 | |
GB | 16.05.2001 | ||
NL | 16.05.2001 | ||
AT | 30.06.2001 | ||
BE | 30.06.2001 | ||
CH | 30.06.2001 | ||
LI | 30.06.2001 | ||
DK | 16.08.2001 | ||
PT | 16.08.2001 | ||
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
ES | 30.11.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 16.05.2001 | |
GB | 16.05.2001 | ||
NL | 16.05.2001 | ||
AT | 30.06.2001 | ||
BE | 30.06.2001 | ||
CH | 30.06.2001 | ||
LI | 30.06.2001 | ||
DK | 16.08.2001 | ||
PT | 16.08.2001 | ||
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
Former [2003/10] | FI | 16.05.2001 | |
GB | 16.05.2001 | ||
NL | 16.05.2001 | ||
AT | 30.06.2001 | ||
BE | 30.06.2001 | ||
CH | 30.06.2001 | ||
LI | 30.06.2001 | ||
PT | 16.08.2001 | ||
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
Former [2003/09] | FI | 16.05.2001 | |
GB | 16.05.2001 | ||
NL | 16.05.2001 | ||
BE | 30.06.2001 | ||
CH | 30.06.2001 | ||
LI | 30.06.2001 | ||
PT | 16.08.2001 | ||
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
Former [2003/01] | FI | 16.05.2001 | |
GB | 16.05.2001 | ||
BE | 30.06.2001 | ||
CH | 30.06.2001 | ||
LI | 30.06.2001 | ||
PT | 16.08.2001 | ||
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/29] | FI | 16.05.2001 | |
GB | 16.05.2001 | ||
BE | 30.06.2001 | ||
PT | 16.08.2001 | ||
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/27] | FI | 16.05.2001 | |
GB | 16.05.2001 | ||
PT | 16.08.2001 | ||
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/18] | FI | 16.05.2001 | |
GB | 16.05.2001 | ||
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/16] | FI | 16.05.2001 | |
GB | 16.05.2001 | ||
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | FI | 16.05.2001 | |
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/05] | SE | 16.08.2001 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB934458 (ALLIED CHEM) [A] 1,2* page 1, line 14 - line 65 *; | [A]US3337478 (RICHARD DOUGLAS S) [A] 1,2 * example III *; | [A]EP0253172 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-4,7,9 * page 5, line 1 - line 5; example 4; claims 1,2,6 *; | [DA]US5343639 (KILGORE BRUCE J [US], et al) [DA] 1-3,5-9 * claim 8 * |