EP0930076 - Pharmaceutical compositions comprising CS-866 and insulin resistance improving agents and their use for the treatment of arteriosclerosis and xanthoma [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/29] | MEDICINAL COMPOSITIONS | ||
[2004/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.11.2005 [2005/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sankyo Company Limited 5-1 Nihonbashi Honcho 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0023 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/29] | For all designated states SANKYO COMPANY LIMITED 5-1 Nihonbashi Honcho 3-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUJITA, Yoshio, Sankyo Company, Limited 2-58, Hiromachi 1-chome, Shinagawa-ku Toyko 140 / JP | 02 /
FUJIWARA, Toshihiko, Sankyo Company, Limited 2-58, Hiromachi 1-chome, Shinagawa-ku Toyko 140 / JP | 03 /
SADA, Toshio, Sankyo Company, Limited 2-58, Hiromachi 1-chome, Shinagawa-ku Toyko 140 / JP | 04 /
MAEDA, Naoyuki, Sankyo Company, Limited 2-58, Hiromachi 1-chome, Shinagawa-ku Toyko 140 / JP | [1999/29] | Representative(s) | Gibson, Christian John Robert Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/29] | Gibson, Christian John Robert MARKS & CLERK, 57/60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 97930762.6 | 11.07.1997 | [1999/29] | WO1997JP02407 | Priority number, date | JP19960184368 | 15.07.1996 Original published format: JP 18436896 | [1999/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9802183 | Date: | 22.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0930076 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0930076 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.01.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/06, A61K31/33, A61P9/10, A61P43/00 | [2004/24] | CPC data not yet available |
Former IPC [1999/29] | A61K45/06, A61K31/33 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/29] | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN enthaltend CS-866 und INSULINRESISTENZ VERBESSERNDEM MITTELN und deren Verwendung zur Behandlung von Arteriosklerose und XANTHOM | [2004/24] | English: | Pharmaceutical compositions comprising CS-866 and insulin resistance improving agents and their use for the treatment of arteriosclerosis and xanthoma | [2004/24] | French: | Compositions pharmaceutiques comprenant CS-866 et des agents reforçants de la resistance a l'insuline et leur utilisation pour le traitement de la sclerose en plaques et du xanthome | [2004/24] |
Former [1999/29] | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | ||
Former [1999/29] | MEDICINAL COMPOSITIONS | ||
Former [1999/29] | COMPOSITIONS MEDICINALES | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.1999 | Translation filed | 28.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.1999 | Search fee paid | 28.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 28.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/29] | 11.01.2002 | Request for decision received: (all rights) | 18.02.2002 | Result of request for decision ((all rights)): Request accepted | 24.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01124669.1 / EP1175902 | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0219782 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [Y] 1-46 * claim - *; | [DY]EP0332332 (PFIZER [US]) [DY] 1-46 * page 3, line 18 - line 32; claim - *; | [Y]EP0411395 (THERA PATENT VERWALTUNGS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-46 * claim - *; | [Y]EP0425956 (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]) [Y] 1-46 * claim - *; | [DY]US5223522 (CLARK DAVID A [US], et al) [DY] 1-46 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 4; claim - *; | [Y]EP0603419 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP]) [Y] 1-46 * page 70, paragraph L; claim - *; | [Y]WO9419347 (SANKYO CO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-46* abstract *; | [YD]WO9526188 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [YD] 1-46 * claim - * | International search | [A] - TORU MURAKAMI, NOBUHIRO YAMADA, "STRIDES OF MEDICINE, (1995), Vol. 174, No. 10, TORU MURAKAMI, NOBUHIRO YAMADA, Can ACE Inhibitors Prevent Arteriosclerosis? (in Japanese)", STRIDES OF MEDICINE, XX, JP, JP, (19950902), vol. 174, no. 10, pages 810 - 813, XP002965198 |