EP0913818 - MAGNETO-OPTICAL RECORDING MEDIUM, ITS REPRODUCING METHOD AND REPRODUCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2006 [2006/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HITACHI MAXELL, LTD. 1-88, Ushitora-1-chome, Ibaraki-shi Osaka-fu 567 / JP | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | For all designated states HITACHI MAXELL, LTD. 1-88, Ushitora-1-chome, Ibaraki-shi Osaka-fu 567 / JP | ||
For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OONUKI, Satoru 1-2-1, Togashira Toride-shi, Ibaraki 302 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIHIRO, Masafumi 4-2-1, Matsumaedai, Moriya-machi Kitasouma-gun, Ibaraki 302-01 / JP | 03 /
NAGAI, Nobuyuki 6-8-22, Kinunodai, Yawara-mura Tsukuba-gun, Ibaraki 300-24 / JP | 04 /
SHIMAZAKI, Katsusuke 4-2-1, Matsumaedai, Moriya-machi Kitasouma-gun, Ibaraki 302-01 / JP | 05 /
AWANO, Hiroyuki 1614-5, Yamazaki Noda-shi, Chiba 278 / JP | 06 /
SHIRAI, Hiroshi 4-2-1, Matsumaedai, Moriya-machi Kitasouma-gun, Ibaraki 302-01 / JP | 07 /
OHTA, Norio 6-16-9, Kinunodai, Yawara-mura Tsukuba-gun, Ibaraki 300-24 / JP | 08 /
SUMI, Satoshi 134-1, Iwai Gifu-city, Gifu 501-31 / JP | 09 /
YAMAGUCHI, Atsushi 4-14, Kuzegawa-cho Ogaki-city, Gifu 503 / JP | [1999/18] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 97930771.7 | 11.07.1997 | [1999/18] | WO1997JP02419 | Priority number, date | JP19960182900 | 12.07.1996 Original published format: JP 18290096 | [1999/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9802877 | Date: | 22.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0913818 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.01.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G11B11/10 | [1999/18] | CPC: |
G11B11/10515 (EP,US);
G11B11/10 (KR);
G11B11/10521 (EP,US);
G11B11/10584 (EP,US);
G11B11/10595 (EP,US);
G11B27/19 (EP,US);
G11B27/3027 (EP,US);
G11B11/10508 (EP,US);
G11B11/10528 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/18] | Title | German: | MAGNETOOPTISCHES AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM, ZUGEHÖRIGES WIEDERGABEVERFAHREN- UND GERÄT | [1999/18] | English: | MAGNETO-OPTICAL RECORDING MEDIUM, ITS REPRODUCING METHOD AND REPRODUCER | [1999/18] | French: | SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT MAGNETO-OPTIQUE, PROCEDE DE REPRODUCTION ET DISPOSITIF DE REPRODUCTION | [1999/18] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.1998 | Translation filed | 24.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.1998 | Search fee paid | 24.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 24.09.1998 | Examination requested [1999/18] | 06.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/09] | 22.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2005 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH087350 ; | [A]EP0618572 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,8,16,21,27,33 * page 12, line 15 - page 17, line 32 *; | [PA]WO9722969 (HITACHI MAXELL [JP], et al) [PA] 1-4,8,10-12,16-50 * abstract *; | [DA]EP0619577 (CANON KK [JP]) [DA] 1-50 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0318925 (SONY CORP [JP]) [DA] 1-50 * the whole document *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960531), vol. 1996, no. 05, & JP08007350 A 19960112 (HITACHI LTD;OTHERS: 01) [X] 8,9,16,21,22,27,30,33,40 * abstract * | [DA] - MALMHAELL R ET AL, "MAGNETIC SPIN DIRECTIONS IN DIRECT OVERWRITE EXCHANGE-COUPLED MO DISK", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE; OPTICAL DATA STORAGE 1992, Bellingham, WA, USA, (1992), vol. 1663, pages 204 - 213, XP000974779 [DA] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.137544 | International search | [Y]JPH06295479 (CANON KK); | [A]JPH02235234 (CANON KK); | [P]JPH09138982 (SONY CORP); | [A]JPH04325948 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [P]JPH0981979 (SHARP KK); | [A]JPH08161788 (FUKADA SO); | [A]JPH0773519 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP); | [A]JPH0737283 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JPH03203051 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) |