EP0919552 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF 2,6-DISUBSTITUTED BENZOTHIOPHENE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.08.2003 [2003/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEIKOKU HORMONE MFG. CO., LTD. 5-1, Akasaka 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8522 / JP | [1999/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIRAIWA, Masafumi 412-5-904, Imai-cho, Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 240-0035 / JP | 02 /
SATO, Shuichiro 1-22-12-312, Shimokodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-0041 / JP | 03 /
DOGUCHI, Koji 5-14-6, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-0053 / JP | [1999/22] | Representative(s) | Weisert, Annekäte, et al Patentanwälte Kraus & Weisert Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/22] | Weisert, Annekäte, Dipl.-Ing. Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Kraus Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97930789.9 | 15.07.1997 | [1999/22] | WO1997JP02440 | Priority number, date | JP19960212200 | 24.07.1996 Original published format: JP 21220096 | [1999/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9803501 | Date: | 29.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0919552 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.01.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07D333/54, C07D333/62, C07C323/22, C07D333/56 | [1999/36] | CPC: |
C07C323/22 (EP,US);
C07D333/54 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/22] | C07D333/54, C07D333/62, C07C323/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/22] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 2,6-DISUBSTITUIERTEN BENZOTHIOPHENVERBINDUNGEN | [1999/22] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF 2,6-DISUBSTITUTED BENZOTHIOPHENE COMPOUNDS | [1999/22] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE COMPOSES DE BENZOTHIOPHENE 2,6-DISUBSTITUE | [1999/22] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.1999 | Translation filed | 19.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.1999 | Search fee paid | 19.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 19.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/22] | 01.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/33] | 14.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9427985 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * page 7 *; | [Y]US2949471 (VINZENZ PREY) [Y] 1-7 * example 7 *; | [DY]EP0641791 (TEIKOKU HORMONE MFG CO LTD [JP]) [DY] 1-7 * page 9 *; | [Y] - PAILER ET AL., "Synthesis and paper chromatographic estimation ...", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19610724), vol. 55, no. 15, column 14422c, XP002109156 [Y] 1-7 * abstract * | [Y] - EFFENBERGER ET AL., "Darstellung und Reaktionen ...", CHEM.BER., (1982), vol. 115, no. 12, pages 3719 - 3736, XP002109154 [Y] 1-7 * page 3725 * | [DA] - GRAHAM ET AL., "Topically active carbonic anhydrase inhibitors ...", J.MED.CHEM., (1989), vol. 32, pages 2548 - 2554, XP002109155 [DA] * page 2549 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00132a009 | International search | [Y]JPH05140148 (TEIKOKU HORMONE MFG CO LTD) | [Y] - CHUM. THER., Vol. 8, No. 5, (1973), DESCAMPS M. et al., "Recherches Dans la Serie des Benzo(b)Thiophenes. II. Acides Benzo(b)Thienyl-2 ou -3 Acetiques, Agents Anti-Inflammatoires Potentiels", p. 536-544. | [A] - SYNTHESIS, No. 4, (1985), DE GROOT, AEDE, "A Novel Synthesis of 1-Benzothiophenes from 2-(Phynylthio)-Aldehydes", p. 434-436. |