EP0928803 - FLUORINATED ORGANOSILICON COMPOUNDS AND PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.05.2003 [2003/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | For all designated states CROMPTON CORPORATION One American Lane Greenwich Connecticut 06831-2559 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/08] | For all designated states ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | ||
For all designated states CROMPTON CORPORATION One American Lane Greenwich Connecticut 06831-2559 / US | |||
Former [2000/13] | For all designated states ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | ||
For all designated states OSi Specialties, Inc. One American Lane Greenwich, Connecticut 06831 / US | |||
Former [1999/28] | For all designated states ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. 1-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
For all designated states OSi Specialties, Inc. One American Lane Greenwich, Connecticut 06831 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FURUKAWA, Yutaka 73-7, Kibougaoka, Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 241 / JP | 02 /
KOTERA, Mami 102, Sejuru Akasaka, 138, Sugeta-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221 / JP | 03 /
KUMAI, Seisaku 1-10-21, Shirahata Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 251 / JP | 04 /
RUCKLE, Robert, E., Jr. 22 Brewster Woods Brewster, NY 10507 / US | 05 /
MURPHY, Gerald, J. 8 Mockingbird Court Hopewell Junction, NY 12533 / US | [1999/28] | Representative(s) | Perrey, Ralf, et al Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/08] | Perrey, Ralf, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Müller-Boré & Partner, Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/28] | Perrey, Ralf, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Müller-Boré & Partner, Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97930797.2 | 15.07.1997 | [1999/28] | WO1997JP02449 | Priority number, date | JP19960207776 | 18.07.1996 Original published format: JP 20777696 | [1999/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9803574 | Date: | 29.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0928803 | Date: | 14.07.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0928803 | Date: | 22.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.01.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/16, C08G77/24, C08G77/46 | [1999/28] | CPC: |
C08G77/385 (EP,US);
C08G77/24 (EP,US);
C08G77/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1999/28] | Title | German: | FLUORIERTE ORGANOSILICONVERBINDUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [1999/28] | English: | FLUORINATED ORGANOSILICON COMPOUNDS AND PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF | [1999/28] | French: | COMPOSES ORGANOSILICIES FLUORES ET LEUR PROCEDE DE PREPARATION | [1999/28] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.1999 | Translation filed | 11.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.1999 | Search fee paid | 11.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 11.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/28] | 07.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPS6483085 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [X] 1,5 * page 3, right column, first formula * * claim 1 * [A] 2-4,6-8; | [A]EP0640888 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * claims 1,6 * | International search | [X]JPS6094485 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD, et al); | [X]JPS6094486 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD, et al) |