EP1021205 - SYNTHESIS OF FERROCENYL PHENYLTROPANE ANALOGS AND THEIR RADIO-TRANSFORMATION TO TECHNETIUM NEUROPROBES FOR MAPPING MONOAMINE REUPTAKE SITES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2005 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amersham plc Amersham Place Little Chalfont Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/13] | For all designated states Amersham plc Amersham Place Little Chalfont Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | ||
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states Amersham plc The Grove Centre, White Lion Road Amersham, Buckinghamshire HP7 9LL / GB | ||
Former [2000/30] | For all designated states NYCOMED AMERSHAM PLC 466 devon Park Drive Wayne, PA 19087 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEUMEYER, John, L. 1 Holiday Road Wayland, MA 01778 / US | 02 /
TAMAGNAN, Gilles 446 Old Connecticut Path 7 Framingham, MA 01701 / US | 03 /
GAO, Yigong 6 Tammie Road Hopedale, MA 01747 / US | [2000/30] | Representative(s) | Canning, Lewis R., et al GE Healthcare Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/11] | Canning, Lewis R., et al Amersham plc Amersham Place Little Chalfont, Bucks. HP7 9NA / GB | ||
Former [2002/29] | Canning, Lewis R. Amersham plc The Grove Centre White Lion Road Amersham Buckinghamshire HP7 9LL / GB | ||
Former [2000/30] | Eastwood, Simon Christopher Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 97931013.3 | 12.06.1997 | [2000/30] | WO1997US09308 | Priority number, date | US19960662656 | 13.06.1996 Original published format: US 662656 | [2000/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9747328 | Date: | 18.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/54] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1021205 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1021205 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.12.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K51/00, A61M36/14, A61K51/04 | [2002/17] | CPC: |
C07F17/00 (EP,US);
A61K51/0487 (EP,US);
A61K2123/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/30] | A61K51/00, A61M36/14 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/30] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON FERROCENYLPHENYLTROPAN-ANALOGEN, UND DEREN UMWANDLUNG ZU TECHNETIUM-MARKIERTEN NEUROSONDEN ZUM ERFASSEN VON MONOAMIN-WIEDERAUFNAHMESTELLEN | [2000/30] | English: | SYNTHESIS OF FERROCENYL PHENYLTROPANE ANALOGS AND THEIR RADIO-TRANSFORMATION TO TECHNETIUM NEUROPROBES FOR MAPPING MONOAMINE REUPTAKE SITES | [2000/30] | French: | SYNTHESE D'ANALOGUES DE FERROCENYL PHENYLTROPANE ET LEUR RADIO-TRANSFORMATION EN NEURO-SONDES AU TECHNETIUM POUR LA CARTOGRAPHIE DE SITES DE REABSORPTION DES MONOAMINES | [2000/30] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.1998 | Search fee paid | 10.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.12.1998 | Examination requested [2000/30] | 03.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 10.03.2004 | CH | 10.03.2004 | IT | 10.03.2004 | LI | 10.03.2004 | NL | 10.03.2004 | ES | 21.06.2004 | [2008/07] |
Former [2005/05] | BE | 10.03.2004 | |
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
ES | 21.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | BE | 10.03.2004 | |
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
ES | 21.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | BE | 10.03.2004 | |
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | CH | 10.03.2004 | |
LI | 10.03.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9118908 (DIAGNOSTIKFORSCHUNG INST [DE]) [X] 1-24 * page 3, paragraph 3; claim - *; | [PA]WO9639198 (RES BIOCHEMICALS LIMITED PARTN [US]) [PA] 1-24 * claim - * | [PX] - ZOGHBI, S. S. (1) ET AL, "Synthesis of a dopamine transporter binding cyclopentadiene phenyltropane conjugate complexed with Re and Tc-99m.", JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, (1997) VOL. 38, NO. 5 SUPPL., PP. 100P. MEETING INFO.: 44TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE SOCIETY OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE SAN ANTONIO, TEXAS, USA JUNE 1-5, 1997, XP002191970 [PX] 1-24 * abstract * | International search | [A] - "Synthesis and Ligand Binding of Etabeta-(2beta-Carbomethoxy-3beta-Phenyltropane) Transition Metal Complexes", J. MED. CHEM., ARONSON B ET AL., vol. 39, no. 7, pages 1560 - 1563, XP002955377 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm9508797 |