EP0921847 - USE OF NON-PARTICULATE SORBENTS FOR SIMULATED MOVING BED SEPARATING METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2004 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.03.2004 [2004/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/24] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜLLER, Egbert Elbestrasse 70 D-64390 Erzhausen / DE | 02 /
SCHULTE, Michael Im grossen Ramsee 20 D-64428 Rüsselsheim / DE | 03 /
WIELAND, Gerhard Im Bangert 19 D-64625 Bensheim / DE | 04 /
CABRERA, Karin Mühlweg 14 D-63303 Dreieich / DE | 05 /
DELP, Axel Bahnhofstrasse 29 D-64407 Fränkisch Crumbach / DE | 06 /
LUBDA, Dieter Im Bangert 21 c D-64625 Bensheim / DE | [1999/24] | Application number, filing date | 97931797.1 | 08.07.1997 | [1999/24] | WO1997EP03601 | Priority number, date | DE1996129208 | 19.07.1996 Original published format: DE 19629208 | DE1997126151 | 20.06.1997 Original published format: DE 19726151 | [1999/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9803242 | Date: | 29.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0921847 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0921847 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B01D15/08, B01J8/04, B01D53/04, G01N30/48 | [1999/24] | CPC: |
B01J20/283 (EP);
B01D15/1828 (EP);
B01J20/103 (EP);
B01J20/28042 (EP);
B01J20/28078 (EP);
B01J20/28083 (EP);
B01J20/28085 (EP);
B01J20/28092 (EP);
B01J20/286 (EP);
B01J20/287 (EP);
B01J20/29 (EP);
B01J20/3204 (EP);
B01J20/3246 (EP);
B01D2215/023 (EP);
B01J2220/54 (EP);
B01J2220/56 (EP);
B01J2220/58 (EP);
B01J2220/82 (EP);
G01N2030/528 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1999/24] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG NICHT-PARTIKULÄRER SORBENTIEN FÜR "SIMULATED MOVING BED" TRENNVERFAHREN | [1999/24] | English: | USE OF NON-PARTICULATE SORBENTS FOR SIMULATED MOVING BED SEPARATING METHODS | [1999/24] | French: | UTILISATION DE SORBANTS NON PARTICULAIRES POUR DES PROCEDES DE SEPARATION A "LIT MOBILE SIMULE" | [1999/24] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/24] | 02.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2985589 (BROUGHTON DONALD B, et al) [Y] 1,2,4,5 * figure - *; | [XY]US4533398 (NEUZIL RICHARD W [US], et al) [X] 1,4 * column 6, lines 11-34 * * column 10, line 41 - column 11, line 66 * [Y] 2,5; | [AD]DE4028326 (SARTORIUS GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-6 * page 5, lines 10-64 ** page 10, line 37 - page 11, line 21 *; | [YD]WO9419687 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [YD] 1,4 * page 1, lines 18-31; claim 1 *; | [YD]WO9503256 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [YD] 1,2,4,5 * page 22, lines 15-30; claims 1,2,5 * |