EP0912621 - POLYISOCYANATE-BASED POLYMER COMPRISING METAL SALTS AND PREPARATION OF METAL POWDERS THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2001 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2001 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.07.2001 [2001/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [1999/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRUNBAUER, Henri J. M. Schorpioen 45 4501 HC Oostburg / NL | 02 /
BROOS, Jacobus A. F. Karel Doormanlaan 43 4535 BP Terneuzen / NL | 03 /
PICKIN, Kevin Lodge House, Ladbroke Leamington Spa, Warwickshire, CV33 ODF / GB | [1999/18] | Representative(s) | Raynor, John Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | Raynor, John W.H. Beck, Greener & Co 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97931968.8 | 21.07.1997 | [1999/18] | WO1997GB01956 | Priority number, date | GB19960015373 | 22.07.1996 Original published format: GB 9615373 | [1999/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9803569 | Date: | 29.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0912621 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0912621 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/30, C08K3/00, B01J37/00 | [1999/18] | CPC: |
C08G18/302 (EP,US);
C08G18/30 (KR);
C08K3/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/18] | Title | German: | METALLSALZE ENTHALTENDES POLYMER AUF BASIS VON POLYISOCYANATEN UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTE METALLPULVER | [1999/24] | English: | POLYISOCYANATE-BASED POLYMER COMPRISING METAL SALTS AND PREPARATION OF METAL POWDERS THEREFROM | [1999/18] | French: | POLYMERE A BASE DE POLYISOCYANATE COMPORTANT DES SELS METALLIQUES ET PREPARATION DE POUDRES METALLIQUES A PARTIR DE CE POLYMERE | [1999/18] |
Former [1999/18] | METALLSALZE ENTHALTENDES POLYMER UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTE METALLPULVER | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/18] | 04.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 12.04.2000 | [2001/29] | Cited in | International search | [DA]US3510323 (WISMER MARCO, et al) [DA] 1* column 1, line 27 - column 8, line 44 *; | [X]US4367259 (FULMER GLENN E, et al) [X] 1-5,7-9 * column 2, line 10 - column 7, line 51; example -; claims 1-7 *; | [A]EP0087160 (COMP GENERALE ELECTRICITE [FR]) [A] 1,18 * page 2, line 5 - page 4, line 28; claims 1-6 *; | [D]US4569821 (DUPERRAY GERARD [FR], et al); | [A]EP0552133 (INST GAS TECHNOLOGY [US]) [A] 1,18 * page 3, line 43 - page 6, line 10; claim - *; | JPH0797566 [ ] (TOKAI RUBBER IND LTD, et al); | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 23, Database accession no. 175486, XP002043689 [X] 1 * abstract * |