EP0929904 - LIFTER WITH ELECTROPERMANENT MAGNETS PROVIDED WITH A SAFETY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Railfix N.V. Landhuis Joonchi, Kaya Richard J. Beaujon z/n Curacao / AN | [1999/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELIAS, Gregory, E. Isla Pal y Tam Brakkeput,Ariba Curacao / AN | [1999/29] | Representative(s) | Pizzoli, Antonio Mario, et al Società Italiana Brevetti SpA Via G. Carducci 8 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/29] | Pizzoli, Antonio, et al Società Italiana Brevetti SpA, Via Carducci, 8 20213 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 97931980.3 | 04.08.1997 | [1999/29] | WO1997IB00960 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9908293 | Date: | 18.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0929904 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0929904 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01F7/04, B66C1/04, H01F7/02 | [1999/29] | CPC: |
H01F7/04 (EP,US);
B66C1/04 (EP,KR,US);
B66C1/08 (KR);
G01R33/07 (KR);
H01F7/0257 (EP,US);
H01F2007/208 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/29] | Title | German: | HEBER MIT ELEKTROPERMANENTMAGNETEN MIT EINER SICHERHEITSVORRICHTUNG | [1999/29] | English: | LIFTER WITH ELECTROPERMANENT MAGNETS PROVIDED WITH A SAFETY DEVICE | [1999/29] | French: | ELECTRO-AIMANT PERMANENT DE LEVAGE A DISPOSITIF DE SECURITE | [1999/29] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/29] | 09.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.05.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.08.2001 | DK | 04.08.2001 | FI | 04.08.2001 | GB | 04.08.2001 | LU | 04.08.2001 | ES | 05.08.2001 | SE | 05.08.2001 | BE | 31.08.2001 | CH | 31.08.2001 | LI | 31.08.2001 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/28] | AT | 04.08.2001 | |
DK | 04.08.2001 | ||
FI | 04.08.2001 | ||
GB | 04.08.2001 | ||
ES | 05.08.2001 | ||
SE | 05.08.2001 | ||
BE | 31.08.2001 | ||
CH | 31.08.2001 | ||
LI | 31.08.2001 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 04.08.2001 | |
DK | 04.08.2001 | ||
FI | 04.08.2001 | ||
GB | 04.08.2001 | ||
SE | 05.08.2001 | ||
BE | 31.08.2001 | ||
CH | 31.08.2001 | ||
LI | 31.08.2001 | ||
Former [2003/10] | AT | 04.08.2001 | |
FI | 04.08.2001 | ||
GB | 04.08.2001 | ||
SE | 05.08.2001 | ||
BE | 31.08.2001 | ||
CH | 31.08.2001 | ||
LI | 31.08.2001 | ||
Former [2003/06] | FI | 04.08.2001 | |
GB | 04.08.2001 | ||
SE | 05.08.2001 | ||
BE | 31.08.2001 | ||
CH | 31.08.2001 | ||
LI | 31.08.2001 | ||
Former [2003/01] | FI | 04.08.2001 | |
GB | 04.08.2001 | ||
SE | 05.08.2001 | ||
CH | 31.08.2001 | ||
LI | 31.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/37] | FI | 04.08.2001 | |
GB | 04.08.2001 | ||
SE | 05.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/33] | FI | 04.08.2001 | |
SE | 05.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/27] | SE | 05.08.2001 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH04345498 ; | [A]GB2043354 (CARDONE TECNOMAGNETICA) [A] 1 * figure 4 *; | [A]US4965695 (BAUMANN JOSEPH D [BR]); | [A]WO9703911 (RAILFIX N V [NL], et al) [A] 1 * figure 1; claims 13,17,18 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930420), vol. 017, no. 201, Database accession no. (M - 1399), & JP04345498 A 19921201 (FUJI JIKOU KK) [A] * abstract * |