EP0918895 - PENETRATION-RESISTANT ARAMID ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2001 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.05.2001 [2001/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/22] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIOU, Minshon, J. 11803 Glendevon Road Chesterfield, VA 23838 / US | 02 /
FOY, Brian, Emmett 8000 Gates Bluff Court Chesterfield, VA 23832 / US | 03 /
MINER, Louis, Henry 204 Winding Lane Kennett Square, PA 19348 / US | [1999/22] | Representative(s) | Woodman, Derek Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/22] | Woodman, Derek Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 97932253.4 | 23.06.1997 | [1999/22] | WO1997US10886 | Priority number, date | US19960669655 | 24.06.1996 Original published format: US 669655 | [1999/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9749849 | Date: | 31.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/57] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0918895 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0918895 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | D03D15/00, F41H5/04, A41D31/00 | [1999/22] | CPC: |
B32B5/00 (EP,US);
B32B5/26 (US);
B32B5/024 (US);
D03D1/0052 (EP,US);
D03D13/008 (EP,US);
F41H5/0485 (EP,US);
B32B2262/0269 (US);
B32B2571/02 (US);
D10B2331/021 (EP,US);
Y10S428/902 (EP,US);
Y10S428/911 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24612 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2817 (EP,US);
Y10T428/298 (EP,US);
Y10T428/30 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/22] | Title | German: | PENETRATIONSBESTÄNDIGER ARAMID-ARTIKEL | [1999/30] | English: | PENETRATION-RESISTANT ARAMID ARTICLE | [1999/22] | French: | ARTICLE EN ARAMIDE RESISTANT A LA PENETRATION | [1999/30] |
Former [1999/22] | PENETRATIONSRESISTENTE ARAMID-ARTIKEL | ||
Former [1999/22] | PROTEINE MIP (PROTEINE INTERAGISSANT AVEC LA MKK3 (PROTEINE KINASE ACTIVEE PAR LE MITOGENE)-KINASE-3] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/22] | 02.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4522871 (ARMELLINO JR RICHARD A [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 44 - line 63; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0169432 (MEHLER AG V [DE]) [A] 1,3 * page 8, lines 11-15 * * page 9, line 4 - line 25 *; | [AD]US4850050 (DROSTE REINHARD [DE], et al) [AD] 1* claim 1 *; | [A]EP0519359 (AKZO NV [NL]) [A] 1,3 * column 7, line 48 - column 8, line 5 * * column 10, line 17 - line 28 *; | [A]WO9300564 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [A]US5185195 (HARPELL GARY A [US], et al) [A] 1,4,5 * column 6, line 47 - column 7, line 15 *; | [A]EP0569849 (AKZO NV [NL]) [A] 1,2 * column 4, line 19 - line 31 * |