EP0979101 - RECOMBINANT CANINE ADENOVIRUS 2 (CAV2) CONTAINING EXOGENOUS DNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/07] | RECOMBINANT CANINE ADENOVIRUS (CAV) CONTAINING EXOGENOUS DNA | ||
[2010/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2011 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 18.01.2012 [2012/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merial, Inc. 254, rue Marcel Merieux, Boîte postale 7009 Lyon 07 / FR | [2010/43] |
Former [2000/07] | For all designated states Merial, Inc. 254, rue Marcel Merieux, Boîte postale 7009 Lyon 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FISCHER, Laurent 46 Oakwood Street Albany, NY 12208 / US | [2000/07] | Representative(s) | Harding, Charles Thomas, et al D Young & Co LLP Briton House Briton Street Southampton SO14 3EB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | Harding, Charles Thomas, et al D Young & Co. Briton House, Briton Street Southampton SO14 3EB / GB | ||
Former [2000/07] | Bernasconi, Jean, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix, 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 97932430.8 | 30.06.1997 | [2000/07] | WO1997US11486 | Priority number, date | US19960675556 | 03.07.1996 Original published format: US 675556 | US19960675566 | 03.07.1996 Original published format: US 675566 | [2000/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9800166 | Date: | 08.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0979101 | Date: | 16.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0979101 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.01.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/235, A61K39/42, C07H21/04, C07K1/00, C07K14/005, C12P19/34, C12N15/00, C12N15/09, C12N15/34, C12N15/63, C12N15/70 | [2000/07] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
C12N15/86 (EP);
A61K39/00 (EP);
C12N2710/10321 (EP);
C12N2710/10343 (EP);
C12N2760/18422 (EP);
C12N2810/60 (EP);
C12N2810/6018 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/07] | Title | German: | REKOMBINANTER HUNDE-ADENOVIRUS 2 (CAV2), WELCHER EXOGENE DNA ENTHÄLT | [2010/12] | English: | RECOMBINANT CANINE ADENOVIRUS 2 (CAV2) CONTAINING EXOGENOUS DNA | [2010/12] | French: | ADENOVIRUS CANIN 2 RECOMBINANT (ACR2) CONTENANT DE l'ADN EXOGENE | [2010/12] |
Former [2000/07] | REKOMBINANTER HUNDE-ADENOVIRUS (CAV), WELCHER EXOGENE DNA ENTHÄLT | ||
Former [2000/07] | RECOMBINANT CANINE ADENOVIRUS (CAV) CONTAINING EXOGENOUS DNA | ||
Former [2000/07] | ADENOVIRUS CANIN DE RECOMBINAISON (ACR) CONTENANT DE l'ADN EXOGENE | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.1999 | Search fee paid | 07.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.01.1999 | Examination requested [2000/07] | 16.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 28.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 27.10.2010 | IT | 27.10.2010 | [2012/03] |
Former [2011/35] | BE | 27.10.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9111525 (UNIV GLASGOW [GB]) [X] 1,2,4-30,54,55 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO9426914 (RHONE POULENC RORER SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-7,9-12,14-25,28-30,54,55 * abstract * * page 3, line 15 - page 4, line 13 * * page 5, line 5 - line 27 * * page 6, line 1 - line 9 * * page 7, line 4 - line 15; figure 3; example 5 * [Y] 1-7,9-12,14-25,28-30,54,55; | [Y]WO9516048 (UNIV SASKATCHEWAN [CA]) [Y] 1-7,9-12,14-25,28-30,54,55 * abstract *; | [Y]WO9612030 (RHONE POULENC RORER SA [FR], et al) [Y] 1-7,9-12,14-25,28-30,54,55 * page 13, line 26 - page 17, line 4 * * page 3, line 31 - page 5, line 32 *; | [Y] - DRAGULEV B P ET AL, "SEQUENCE ANALYSIS OF PUTATIVE E3 AND FIBER GENOMIC REGIONS OF TWO STRAINS OF CANINE ADENOVIRUS TYPE 1", VIROLOGY, RAVEN PRESS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19910701), vol. 183, no. 1, ISSN 0042-6822, pages 298 - 305, XP000607410 [Y] 1-7,9-12,14-25,28-30,54,55 * page 304, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0042-6822(91)90142-X | [PY] - BEARD CLAYTON W ET AL, "Analysis of early region 3 mutants of mouse adenovirus type 1.", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (1996), vol. 70, no. 9, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 5867 - 5874, XP002206290 [PY] 1-7,9-12,14-25,28-30,54,55 * the whole document * * page 5873, column 2, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * | [T] - MORRISON MARK D ET AL, "Generation of E3-deleted canine adenoviruses expressing canine parvovirus capsid by homologous recombination in bacteria.", VIROLOGY, February 1, 2002, (20020201), vol. 293, no. 1, ISSN 0042-6822, pages 26 - 30, XP002206291 [T] 1-30,54,55 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/viro.2001.1262 | International search | [Y]US4963481 (DEVILLIERS JEAN P [US]); | [Y]WO9111525 (UNIV GLASGOW [GB]); | [Y]US5466585 (HORISBERGER MICHEL A [CH], et al); | [Y]US5514582 (CAPON DANIEL J [US], et al) | [Y] - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., June 1994, Vol. 91, No. 13, ENGELHARDT et al., "Ablation of E2A in Recombinant Adenoviruses Improves Transgene Persistence and Decreases Inflammatory Response in Mouse Liver", pages 6196-6200. | [Y] - BIO/TECHNOLOGY, September 1994, Vol. 12, No. 9, DORAI et al., "Mammalian Cell Expression of Single-Chain Fv (sFv) Antibody Proteins and Their C-Terminal Fusions with Interleukin-2 and Other Effector Domains", pages 890-897. | by applicant | US4196265 | US4376110 | US4690915 | US4722848 | EP0265785 | US5019384 | WO9214488 | US5168062 | WO9222641 | US5174993 | WO9303145 | WO9304175 | WO9319170 | US5252479 | US5338683 | US5385839 | GB2269820 | US5421839 | US5494807 | WO9606165 | US5503834 | US5505941 | US5514375 | US5523089 | US5529780 | - NEIDHARDT ET AL., Physiology of the Bacterial Cell., SINAUER ASSOCIATES INC., PUBLISHERS, (1990), page 73 | - MOLECULAR MICROBIOLOGY, (1989), vol. 3, no. 4, pages 479 - 486 | - NEIDHARDT ET AL., Physiology of the Bacterial Cell, SINAUER ASSOCIATES INC, (1990), page 73 | - REICH, PROTEASES AND BIOLOGIGAL CONTROL, (1975), vol. 2, page 54 | - SAMBROOK; FRITSCH; MANIATIS, Molecular Cloning, A LABORATORY MANUAL, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1989), vol. 3 | - GOODMAN-SNITKOFF ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 147, pages 410 - 415 | - MILLER ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1992), vol. 176, pages 1739 - 1744 | - KREUTER, J., Microcapsules and Nanoparticles in Medicine and Pharmacology, CRC PRESS, pages 125 - 148 | - ELDRIDGE, J.H. ET AL., CURRENT TOPICS IN MICROBIOLOGY AND IMMUNOLOGY, (1989), vol. 146, pages 59 - 66 | - MILSTEIN, C., SCIENTIFIC AMERICAN, (1980), vol. 243, page 66 | - FELGNER ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, pages 2550 - 2561 | - SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 2.59, pages 1745 - 49 | WO1992US08697 | US19940184009 | US19940224657 | WO1994US06652 | US19950413118 | US19950416646 | US19950486969 |