EP0909402 - COMPACT DISPLAY SYSTEM WITH TWO STAGE MAGNIFICATION AND IMMERSED BEAM SPLITTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.2003 [2003/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Three-Five Systems, Inc. 1600 North Desert Drive Tempe, AZ 85281-1230 / US | [2002/40] |
Former [2002/36] | For all designated states Inviso, Inc. 1330 Bordeaux Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | ||
Former [2002/32] | For all designated states Three-Five Systems, Inc. 1600 North Desert Drive Tempe, AZ 85281-1230 / US | ||
Former [1999/45] | For all designated states Inviso, Inc. 1330 Bordeaux Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | ||
Former [1999/16] | For all designated states Siliscape, Inc. 1330 Bordeaux Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KINTZ, Gregory, J. 680 Emily Drive Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 02 /
HILDEBRAND, Alfred, P. 1555 Edgewood Drive Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | [1999/16] | Representative(s) | Grubert, Andreas, et al Baker Botts 41 Lothbury Street London EC2R 7HF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/32] | Grubert, Andreas, et al Baker Botts 99 Gresham Street London EC2V 7BA / GB | ||
Former [1999/16] | Holmes, Miles Keeton, et al D. YOUNG & CO., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97932433.2 | 30.06.1997 | [1999/16] | WO1997US11498 | Priority number, date | US19960673894 | 02.07.1996 Original published format: US 673894 | [1999/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9800747 | Date: | 08.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0909402 | Date: | 21.04.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0909402 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/02 | [1999/16] | CPC: |
G02B27/1033 (EP,US);
G02B27/0101 (EP,US);
G02B27/025 (EP,US);
G02B27/1066 (EP,US);
G02B27/126 (EP,US);
G02B27/144 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0118 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0125 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0169 (EP,US);
G02B5/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/16] | Title | German: | KOMPAKT ANZEIGESYSTEM MIT ZWEISTUFIGER VERGROSSERUNG UND IMMERSIONSSTRAHLTEILER | [1999/16] | English: | COMPACT DISPLAY SYSTEM WITH TWO STAGE MAGNIFICATION AND IMMERSED BEAM SPLITTER | [1999/16] | French: | SYSTEME DE VISUALISATION D'ENCOMBREMENT REDUIT UTILISANT UN AGRANDISSEMENT A DEUX ETAGES ET UN SEPARATEUR DE FAISCEAU IMMERGE | [1999/16] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/16] | 23.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 29.09.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 01.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47] | Request for further processing for: | 01.12.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 01.12.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.12.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.07.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.07.1999 | 30.06.2002 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   05.07.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 27.11.2002 | PT | 27.02.2003 | [2003/31] |
Former [2003/29] | PT | 27.02.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4627688 (KOBAYASHI TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4,15,17,18,29,34-36* column 5, line 65 - column 7, line 16; figures 2-5; claims 1,3 *; | [A]EP0566004 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [A] 1-8,15,18,19,21,22,34 * column 3, line 29 - column 4, line 57; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0566001 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [A] 1,15,29 * page 4, line 26 - page 5, line 13; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5363241 (HEGG RONALD G [US], et al) [A] 29-33 * column 2, line 21 - column 3, line 15; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US5530586 (YASUGAKI MASATO [JP]) [X] 1,4-7,15,18,19,21,22,34,35 * column 1, line 13 - line 34 * * column 4, line 21 - column 6, line 34 * * column 8, line 47 - column 10, line 42; figures 1,6-10 *; | [A]WO9619746 (SILISCAPE INC [US]) [A] 1-33 * page 10, line 1 - page 29, line 3; figures 1-15 * |