EP0912386 - DEVICE FOR LOCKING AN ADJUSTABLE STEERING COLUMN, ESPECIALLY FOR MOTOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.02.2001 [2001/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADAM OPEL AG Bahnhofsplatz 1 65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | [1999/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLEUEL, Walter Oranienstrasse 25 D-65719 Hofheim / DE | 02 /
MARKARD, Wolfgang Erbsenberg 12 D-65439 Flörsheim / DE | [1999/18] | Representative(s) | Bergerin, Ralf, et al Adam Opel AG Patentwesen/80-34 65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | Bergerin, Ralf, Dipl.-Ing., et al Adam Opel AG Patentwesen 65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 97932731.9 | 03.07.1997 | [1999/18] | WO1997DE01401 | Priority number, date | DE1996129246 | 19.07.1996 Original published format: DE 19629246 | [1999/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9803386 | Date: | 29.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0912386 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0912386 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B62D1/18 | [1999/18] | CPC: |
B62D1/184 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32532 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/18] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERRIEGELUNG EINER VERSTELLBAREN LENKSÄULE, INSBESONDERE FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE | [1999/18] | English: | DEVICE FOR LOCKING AN ADJUSTABLE STEERING COLUMN, ESPECIALLY FOR MOTOR VEHICLES | [1999/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE VERROUILLAGE D'UNE COLONNE DE DIRECTION REGLABLE, NOTAMMENT POUR VEHICULES A MOTEUR | [1999/18] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/18] | 30.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3205416 (AISIN SEIKI [JP]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 33 - page 8, line 12; figure 2 *; | [A]DE3920783 (BMW AG) [A] 1* abstract * |