EP0912442 - USE OF SILICA AS AGENT FOR CONTROLLING THE DEGRADATION OF BICARBONATE, RESULTING MIXTURE AND ITS APPLICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 11.08.2004 [2004/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novacarb 25, quai Paul-Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [1999/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUBELMANN, Michel 29, rue d'Anes de Montardat F-78100 Saint-Germain-en-Laye / FR | 02 /
SEGUIN, Michel 12, rue Saint Paul F-92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | [1999/18] | Representative(s) | Jacobson, Claude, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | Jacobson, Claude, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1999/18] | Wattremez, Catherine, et al Rhodia Services, Direction de la Propriété Industrielle, 25, quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie-Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 97932858.0 | 08.07.1997 | [1999/18] | WO1997FR01234 | Priority number, date | FR19960008458 | 08.07.1996 Original published format: FR 9608458 | [1999/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9801390 | Date: | 15.01.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0912442 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0912442 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/17] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP0912442 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | [2003/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C01B31/24 | [1999/18] | CPC: |
C11D7/20 (EP,US);
A61K8/0241 (EP,US);
A61K8/19 (EP,US);
A61K8/25 (EP,US);
A61Q11/00 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
C01B32/60 (EP,US);
C11D3/124 (EP,US);
C11D7/12 (EP,US);
A61K2800/412 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2003/22] |
Former [2003/16] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, LI | ||
Former [1999/18] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON KIESELSÄURE AUS DEM ABBAU VON BIKARBONAT KONTROLLIERENDEM WIRKSTOFF, MISCHUNG DARAUS UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [1999/18] | English: | USE OF SILICA AS AGENT FOR CONTROLLING THE DEGRADATION OF BICARBONATE, RESULTING MIXTURE AND ITS APPLICATION | [1999/18] | French: | UTILISATION DE SILICE COMME AGENT CONTROLANT LA DEGRADATION DU BICARBONATE, MELANGE RESULTANT ET SON APPLICATION | [1999/18] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/18] | 30.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16] | Request for further processing for: | 10.05.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 10.05.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.05.2001 | Decision despatched | 22.12.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 23.12.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.01.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 31.07.2003 | LI | 31.07.2003 | [2004/33] | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH04170315 ; | [A]DE1546508 (SOLVAY) [A] 1* page 1, line 1 - line 27 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 31, Database accession no. 92-253918, XP002024881 & JPH04170315 A 19920618 (TOSOH CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |