EP0906481 - HOLDER FOR ELECTRONIC INFORMATION CARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.04.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.06.2000 [2000/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fasteners for Retail, Inc. 225 Alpha Park Cleveland, OH 44143 / US | [1999/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUMP, Daniel, J. 473 Riverview Road Gates Mills, OH 44040 / US | 02 /
WAMSLEY, Stephen, D. 15614 Lakewood Heights Boulevard Lakewood, OH 44107 / US | 03 /
BACNIK, James, A. 7652 Chillicothe Road Mentor, OH 44060 / US | [1999/14] | Representative(s) | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/14] | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 97933330.9 | 20.06.1997 | [1999/14] | WO1997US11893 | Priority number, date | US19960020212P | 21.06.1996 Original published format: US 20212 P | [1999/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9748862 | Date: | 24.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/55] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0906481 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.12.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E04G3/00, F21V35/00, G09F3/18, G09F3/20, A47F5/08 | [1999/47] | CPC: |
A47F5/0068 (EP,US);
A47F5/0869 (EP,US);
G09F3/204 (EP,US);
G09F3/201 (EP,US);
Y10S248/923 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/14] | E04G3/00, F21V35/00, G09F3/18, G09F3/20 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/14] | Title | German: | HALTER FÜR ELEKTRONISCHE INFORMATIONEN | [1999/14] | English: | HOLDER FOR ELECTRONIC INFORMATION CARRIER | [1999/14] | French: | SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS ELECTRONIQUES | [1999/14] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.1999 | Search fee paid | 11.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/14] | 27.12.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/24] | 25.01.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US4881707 (GARFINKLE BENJAMIN L [US]); | [A]US5233773 (REYNOLDS RANDY B [US]); | [X]US5575100 (MARVIN RUSSEL H [US], et al) |