EP0916185 - DUAL-BAND MULTILAYER BANDPASS FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2002 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [1999/20] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0050 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITAZAWA, Shoichi 2-11-8, Kofuen Nishinomiya-shi Hyogo 662 / JP | 02 /
YAMADA, Toru 6-4-305, Myokenzaka Katano-shi Osaka 576 / JP | 03 /
ISHIZAKI, Toshio 10-1-505, Okamoto 8-chome Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 658 / JP | 04 /
OGAWA, Koichi 1-17-20, Meguri Hirakata-shi Osaka 573 / JP | 05 /
FUJIKAWA, Makoto 70-8, Tsuji-cho Ikoma-shi Nara 630-02 / JP | 06 /
FUJISAWA, Tadanori 4-3-37, Kyuhoji Yao-shi Osaka 581 / JP | 07 /
ISHIDA, Kaoru 4-35, Kariyanishimachi Shijonawate-shi Osaka 575 / JP | 08 /
NAGATOMI, Yoshitaka 14-1, Saiwai-cho Suita-shi Osaka 564 / JP | [1999/20] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/20] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 97933859.7 | 31.07.1997 | [1999/20] | WO1997JP02660 | Priority number, date | JP19960201614 | 31.07.1996 Original published format: JP 20161496 | [1999/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9805120 | Date: | 05.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0916185 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0916185 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H03H7/01, H01P1/203 | [1999/20] | CPC: |
H01P1/20345 (EP,US);
H01P1/2135 (EP,US);
H03H7/0123 (EP,US);
H03H7/175 (EP,US);
H03H2001/0085 (EP,US);
H03H2250/00 (EP,US);
H03H7/463 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/20] | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTIGER ZWEIBAND-BANDPASSFILTER | [1999/20] | English: | DUAL-BAND MULTILAYER BANDPASS FILTER | [1999/20] | French: | FILTRE PASSE-BANDE A MULTIPLES COUCHES ET DEUX BANDES DE FREQUENCES | [1999/20] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/20] | 12.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 01.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5248949 (EGUCHI KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1,4* column 9, line 66 - column 11, line 12; figures 7A-8A *; | [A]EP0641035 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,4 * page 12, line 20 - line 27 * * page 29, line 44 - page 33, line 15; figure 44 * |