EP0907949 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DYNAMICALLY ADJUSTED TRAINING FOR SPEECH RECOGNITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.2002 [2002/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/15] | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HON, Hsiao-Wuen 14233 214th Way N.E. Woodinville, WA 98072 / US | 02 /
HUANG, Xuedong, D. 10026 177th Avenue N.E. Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 03 /
HWANG, Mei-Yuh 14802 N.E. 68th Street Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 04 /
JIANG, Li Apartment 1119, 14415 N.E. 39th Bellevue, WA 98007 / US | 05 /
JU, Yun-Cheng 14918 S.E. 61st Court Bellevue, WA 98006 / US | 06 /
MAHAJAN, Milind, V. 16624 N.E. 34th Court SS302 Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 07 /
ROZAK, Michael, J. 19423 S.E. May Valley Road Issaquah, WA 98027 / US | [1999/15] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/15] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97934052.8 | 27.06.1997 | [1999/15] | WO1997US11683 | Priority number, date | US19960673435 | 28.06.1996 Original published format: US 673435 | [1999/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9800834 | Date: | 08.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0907949 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0907949 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/06 | [2000/38] | CPC: |
G10L15/063 (EP,US);
G10L2015/0635 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/15] | G10L3/00, G10L5/06, G10L7/08, G10L9/06, G10L9/18, G10L5/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FUER DYNAMISCH EINGESTELLTES TRAINING ZUR SPRACHERKENNUNG | [1999/15] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DYNAMICALLY ADJUSTED TRAINING FOR SPEECH RECOGNITION | [1999/15] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME D'AUTO-APPRENTISSAGE A AJUSTEMENT DYNAMIQUE POUR LA RECONNAISSANCE DE LA PAROLE | [1999/15] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/15] | 09.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2001 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   03.08.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0623914 (CSELT CENTRO STUDI LAB TELECOM [IT])[A] 1-116; | [A]US5390278 (GUPTA VISHWA N [CA], et al) [A] 1-116; | [A]EP0706171 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-116 |